Daily Law Journal
3321 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVF01263 KIRSTEN OBERRY 10/3/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES LLC vs KIRSTEN OBERRY
13CVF01075 QUINCY TANNER 10/3/2013
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs QUINCY TANNER
13CVF01211 MIDWEST TEMPERATURE CONTROLS, LL SERVE: ROBERT BRO... 10/3/2013
ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL, INC. vs MIDWEST TEMPERATURE CONTROLS, LL SERVE: ROBERT BRO...
13CVF01114 KAREN GRIFFIE 10/3/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs KAREN GRIFFIE
12CVG02024 DREW M. INMAN, ET AL. 10/1/2013
HUBER INVESTMENT CORP vs DREW M. INMAN, ET AL.
13CVF01008 AUDRA BELLMAN 9/26/2013
SUNDANCE PROPERYY MGMT vs AUDRA BELLMAN
13CVF01146 TONJA PARRETT 9/26/2013
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORP. vs TONJA PARRETT
13CVG00933 JOSEPH JOBES, ET AL 9/25/2013
THOMAS L REAGAN vs JOSEPH JOBES, ET AL
13CVE00601 RODNEY J. REEDER 9/23/2013
PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INS. CO. vs RODNEY J. REEDER
13CVF00924 MIKE CAMPBELL 9/23/2013
ROOFTEK ROOFING SUPPLIES vs MIKE CAMPBELL
13CVF00725 JAMES M. DAVIS 9/18/2013
TIMBERLINE CONDOMINIUM ASSOC. C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs JAMES M. DAVIS
13CVE00844 MATTHEW FIGLEY 9/17/2013
JAMES JEFFERY vs MATTHEW FIGLEY
13CVF01068 RITA J CHERRY 9/17/2013
CREDIT INVESTMENTS INC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs RITA J CHERRY
13CVF00505 TERRI A. GIFFIN 9/17/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TERRI A. GIFFIN
13CVI01216 DENNIS GEBHART 9/17/2013
JED WOOLDRIDGE vs DENNIS GEBHART
13CVF01007 KATHERINE M SCARBERRY 9/17/2013
CACH, LLC vs KATHERINE M SCARBERRY
13CVE01108 JOSEPH K BRANNON 9/17/2013
STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INS C/O KREINER & PETERS CO, LPA vs JOSEPH K BRANNON
13CVI01045 NIGHT LIGHT SERVICES, INC. C/O ERIC GADBURY 9/17/2013
ALL-BRIGHT JANITORIAL SERVICE vs NIGHT LIGHT SERVICES, INC. C/O ERIC GADBURY
13CVF00699 PRISCILLLA YTTERBO 9/17/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs PRISCILLLA YTTERBO

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 154, 155, 156 ... 165, 166, 167  Next