Daily Law Journal
3307 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVF01075 QUINCY TANNER 10/3/2013
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs QUINCY TANNER
13CVF00923 DONALD ANKENEY 10/3/2013
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs DONALD ANKENEY
13CVF00744 MARION MELTON 10/3/2013
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs MARION MELTON
13CVF01211 MIDWEST TEMPERATURE CONTROLS, LL SERVE: ROBERT BRO... 10/3/2013
ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL, INC. vs MIDWEST TEMPERATURE CONTROLS, LL SERVE: ROBERT BRO...
13CVF00986 MARK ROSS 10/3/2013
SECURITY NAT'L BANK, DIV OF THE PARK NAT'L BANK vs MARK ROSS
13CVF00921 MELEA WHITE 10/3/2013
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs MELEA WHITE
13CVF01114 KAREN GRIFFIE 10/3/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs KAREN GRIFFIE
13CVF00985 PATRICIA D. HAYES 10/3/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs PATRICIA D. HAYES
13CVF00863 LARISSA HEMBREE 10/3/2013
RAZOR CAPITAL II, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A vs LARISSA HEMBREE
13CVF01263 KIRSTEN OBERRY 10/3/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES LLC vs KIRSTEN OBERRY
12CVG02024 DREW M. INMAN, ET AL. 10/1/2013
HUBER INVESTMENT CORP vs DREW M. INMAN, ET AL.
13CVF01008 AUDRA BELLMAN 9/26/2013
SUNDANCE PROPERYY MGMT vs AUDRA BELLMAN
13CVF01146 TONJA PARRETT 9/26/2013
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORP. vs TONJA PARRETT
13CVG00933 JOSEPH JOBES, ET AL 9/25/2013
THOMAS L REAGAN vs JOSEPH JOBES, ET AL
13CVE00601 RODNEY J. REEDER 9/23/2013
PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INS. CO. vs RODNEY J. REEDER
13CVF00924 MIKE CAMPBELL 9/23/2013
ROOFTEK ROOFING SUPPLIES vs MIKE CAMPBELL
13CVF00725 JAMES M. DAVIS 9/18/2013
TIMBERLINE CONDOMINIUM ASSOC. C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs JAMES M. DAVIS
13CVF00505 TERRI A. GIFFIN 9/17/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TERRI A. GIFFIN
13CVE01108 JOSEPH K BRANNON 9/17/2013
STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INS C/O KREINER & PETERS CO, LPA vs JOSEPH K BRANNON

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 153, 154, 155 ... 164, 165, 166  Next