Daily Law Journal
3307 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVF01207 TODD HAACKE 10/17/2013
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO INC. vs TODD HAACKE
13CVF01391 TONYA K STUNICH 10/17/2013
CBCS vs TONYA K STUNICH
13CVF01393 KELLIE R KESSACK 10/17/2013
CBCS vs KELLIE R KESSACK
13CVF01333 JENNIFER MAGGARD 10/17/2013
CONDOR CAPITAL CORP C/O C/O RACHEL J MASON ATTY AT LAW vs JENNIFER MAGGARD
13CVF01392 AMY D DAVIS 10/17/2013
CBCS vs AMY D DAVIS
10CVF01978 NICOLE C POWELL 10/14/2013
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs NICOLE C POWELL
13CVF01102 CHRISTOPHER JONES 10/10/2013
CACH, LLC vs CHRISTOPHER JONES
13CVF01101 REBECCA CAVALIERO 10/10/2013
CACH, LLC vs REBECCA CAVALIERO
13CVF01199 NORMA DOTSON 10/10/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs NORMA DOTSON
13CVF01074 DIANA M KITZMILLER 10/10/2013
ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC vs DIANA M KITZMILLER
13CVF01134 MARY GOORMASTIC 10/9/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs MARY GOORMASTIC
13CVF00656 REMAX SOLUTIONS PLUS ATTN: JEFFREY W FANNIN 10/8/2013
RAYMOND G. RUSSELL vs REMAX SOLUTIONS PLUS ATTN: JEFFREY W FANNIN
13CVF01028 ANTHONY G. BURNS 10/7/2013
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORP. vs ANTHONY G. BURNS
13CVF00148 JEFFREY TREVER 10/7/2013
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs JEFFREY TREVER
13CVF01331 RICHARD ALCOCER 10/7/2013
KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER vs RICHARD ALCOCER
12CVF02231 KIM BRILL 10/3/2013
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs KIM BRILL
13CVF00742 MELANIE PERRY 10/3/2013
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs MELANIE PERRY
13CVE00705 KIMBERLY M. BARNETT 10/3/2013
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. vs KIMBERLY M. BARNETT
13CVF00231 ANDRE WALKER 10/3/2013
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs ANDRE WALKER

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 152, 153, 154 ... 164, 165, 166  Next