Daily Law Journal
3447 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVF01736 MATTHEW T. RUSSELL 3/12/2014
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs MATTHEW T. RUSSELL
14CVF00038 JASON HOFSSCHILD 3/12/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs JASON HOFSSCHILD
14CVF00004 SORAH FAWNDA HAMLETT 3/12/2014
CACH, LLC vs SORAH FAWNDA HAMLETT
13CVF01871 SHAWN ADAMS 3/12/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs SHAWN ADAMS
14CVF00068 TONY SHOCKEY 3/12/2014
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs TONY SHOCKEY
14CVF00033 RUTH I SMITH 3/12/2014
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs RUTH I SMITH
13CVF01936 TERI L. DAVIS 3/12/2014
CBCS vs TERI L. DAVIS
13CVF01823 LAKISHA L BURGER 3/12/2014
STERLING JEWELERS INC. dba JARED-GALLERIA OF JEWELRY vs LAKISHA L BURGER
14CVF00055 TAMMY S FAY 3/12/2014
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs TAMMY S FAY
14CVF00021 LESA PERKINS 3/12/2014
CACH, LLC vs LESA PERKINS
13CVF01935 STACY S. FONTANINI 3/12/2014
CBCS vs STACY S. FONTANINI
14CVF00075 AMBER M GWIN 3/12/2014
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs AMBER M GWIN
13CVF01381 CHRISTINE BALLARD 3/11/2014
FIFTH THIRD BANK AN OHIO BANKING CORPORATION vs CHRISTINE BALLARD
13CVF01949 BEVERLY HARDY 3/6/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES LLC vs BEVERLY HARDY
13CVG01697 GARY HURST 3/6/2014
VICKI FLETCHER vs GARY HURST
14CVF00053 SAM J SCHERKER 3/5/2014
GEO BYERS SONS HOLDING INC vs SAM J SCHERKER
14CVH00264 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 3/4/2014
WOODFORD WEYBRIGHT vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
14CVI00107 WALID SHALASH 3/4/2014
REXEL K POWERS vs WALID SHALASH
14CVI00039 EDWARD L PATCH 3/4/2014
GERALD E GUNNOE vs EDWARD L PATCH

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 149, 150, 151 ... 171, 172, 173  Next