Daily Law Journal
3768 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVF01428 CYNTHIA A. HABEGGER 10/21/2014
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs CYNTHIA A. HABEGGER
14CVI01348 GARY GROFF C/O GROFF AUTO GROUP 10/21/2014
SCHENCK FURNITURE AND APPLIANCES vs GARY GROFF C/O GROFF AUTO GROUP
14CVF01425 PAUL A. KILBY 10/21/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs PAUL A. KILBY
14CVI01345 DEBBIE BUSCHUR 10/21/2014
SCHENCK FURNITURE AND APPLIANCES INC. vs DEBBIE BUSCHUR
14CVF00869 JOSHUA J HALL 10/20/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JOSHUA J HALL
14CVF00795 JUAN C RAMOS 10/20/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JUAN C RAMOS
14CVF01328 JEREMY ODER 10/20/2014
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs JEREMY ODER
14CVF00812 AMANDA LYNCH 10/20/2014
CREDIT ACCEPANCE CORPORATION vs AMANDA LYNCH
14CVF00767 ALI M. ABUAMREH 10/20/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ALI M. ABUAMREH
14CVF00908 WILLIAM T LUSTER JR 10/20/2014
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs WILLIAM T LUSTER JR
14CVF00796 JONATHAN M THOMPSON 10/20/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JONATHAN M THOMPSON
14CVF00069 KALLEB D. MCDOWELL 10/20/2014
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs KALLEB D. MCDOWELL
14CVF01333 MARKITA BEDFORD 10/20/2014
KETTERING HEALTH NETWORK CREDIT UNION vs MARKITA BEDFORD
14CVG00022 DONNA THOMPSON, ET AL 10/17/2014
ORPHEUS L GARRISON vs DONNA THOMPSON, ET AL
96CVF08007 AARON N. JEWETT 10/17/2014
CREDIT ACCEPTANC CORP. vs AARON N. JEWETT
14CVG00206 DEBRA ROBERTS, ET AL 10/17/2014
ORPHEUS L GARRISON vs DEBRA ROBERTS, ET AL
14CVI01287 AMERICAN HOMES 4 RENT 10/16/2014
HEATHER TALLET vs AMERICAN HOMES 4 RENT
14CVF00407 NEELY HAWKINS 10/15/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs NEELY HAWKINS
14CVG00529 RODGER GOTTHARDT 10/15/2014
ED BOCOCK vs RODGER GOTTHARDT

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 148, 149, 150 ... 187, 188, 189  Next