9226 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2101485 | KERN, BEIDGETTE M | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT vs KERN, BEIDGETTE M | |||||||||
CVG2200626 | JACKSON, TOZENE | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROP. MGMT., LLC vs JACKSON, TOZENE | |||||||||
CVG2200613 | MCQUEEN, MAURICE | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
HUNTERS CHASE DAYTON, LLC vs MCQUEEN, MAURICE | |||||||||
CVG2200568 | SUNDERLAND, KYRA | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
RFMILLER HOMES LTD vs SUNDERLAND, KYRA | |||||||||
CVG2200547 | YOUNG, AMANDA | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
HUNTERS CHASE DAYTON, LLC vs YOUNG, AMANDA | |||||||||
CVG2200546 | HURT, DEJA | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
MORGAN PROPERTIES INC vs HURT, DEJA | |||||||||
CVF2200397 | JONES, KALI | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs JONES, KALI | |||||||||
CVF2200365 | POTTENGER, MEGAN E | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA vs POTTENGER, MEGAN E | |||||||||
CVF2200318 | OWENSBY, CARL | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs OWENSBY, CARL | |||||||||
CVF2200317 | SAMS, CAROLYN | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs SAMS, CAROLYN | |||||||||
CVF2200122 | KEYNER, ROLAND | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA vs KEYNER, ROLAND | |||||||||
CVF2101402 | WELLS, BRITNEY | 6/7/2022 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs WELLS, BRITNEY | |||||||||
CVF2101526 | SHORT, CHRISTOPHER | 6/3/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs SHORT, CHRISTOPHER | |||||||||
CVG2200705 | CUNNINGHAM, MICHAEL | 6/2/2022 | |||||||
PSP IDEAL MOBILE HOME PARK LLC vs CUNNINGHAM, MICHAEL | |||||||||
CVF2200420 | GARRETT, TARA | 6/1/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs GARRETT, TARA | |||||||||
CVF2001580 | HAKES, DWAYNE | 5/31/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs HAKES, DWAYNE | |||||||||
CVF2100049 | SCHINDLER, JANET | 5/31/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs SCHINDLER, JANET | |||||||||
CVF2100147 | BRAGG, AMBER | 5/31/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs BRAGG, AMBER | |||||||||
CVF2100343 | SMITH, TAMMY | 5/31/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs SMITH, TAMMY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 141, 142, 143 ... 460, 461, 462 Next |