Daily Law Journal
3091 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVF00924 MIKE CAMPBELL 9/23/2013
ROOFTEK ROOFING SUPPLIES vs MIKE CAMPBELL
13CVF00725 JAMES M. DAVIS 9/18/2013
TIMBERLINE CONDOMINIUM ASSOC. C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs JAMES M. DAVIS
13CVF01068 RITA J CHERRY 9/17/2013
CREDIT INVESTMENTS INC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs RITA J CHERRY
13CVF00505 TERRI A. GIFFIN 9/17/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TERRI A. GIFFIN
13CVI01216 DENNIS GEBHART 9/17/2013
JED WOOLDRIDGE vs DENNIS GEBHART
13CVF01007 KATHERINE M SCARBERRY 9/17/2013
CACH, LLC vs KATHERINE M SCARBERRY
13CVE01108 JOSEPH K BRANNON 9/17/2013
STATE AUTOMOBILE MUTUAL INS C/O KREINER & PETERS CO, LPA vs JOSEPH K BRANNON
13CVI01045 NIGHT LIGHT SERVICES, INC. C/O ERIC GADBURY 9/17/2013
ALL-BRIGHT JANITORIAL SERVICE vs NIGHT LIGHT SERVICES, INC. C/O ERIC GADBURY
13CVF00699 PRISCILLLA YTTERBO 9/17/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs PRISCILLLA YTTERBO
13CVE00844 MATTHEW FIGLEY 9/17/2013
JAMES JEFFERY vs MATTHEW FIGLEY
13CVF01176 ROBERT G KELLY JR 9/16/2013
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs ROBERT G KELLY JR
13CVF00991 HOWARD L. CLANCY 9/16/2013
CACH, LLC vs HOWARD L. CLANCY
13CVF00892 RACHEL L. DAMRON 9/16/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs RACHEL L. DAMRON
05CVH01202 PATRICK BORNS 9/11/2013
DISCOVER BANK vs PATRICK BORNS
13CVF01231 MILDRED F ELROD 9/11/2013
GENERAL ELECTRIC EVENDALE EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs MILDRED F ELROD
13CVI01205 BUTCH MCKINNEY 9/11/2013
WEIDLE CORP vs BUTCH MCKINNEY
13CVF00320 SHARON Y JAMES 9/11/2013
VION HOLDINGS, LLC C/O LAW OFFICE OF CURTIS O BARNE vs SHARON Y JAMES
13CVE00601 RODNEY J. REEDER 9/10/2013
PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INS. CO. vs RODNEY J. REEDER
13CVF00908 TRAVIS W HUNSBARGER 9/10/2013
CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTS vs TRAVIS W HUNSBARGER

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 140, 141, 142 ... 153, 154, 155  Next