9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2200600 | LETT, JASON | 7/5/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs LETT, JASON | |||||||||
CVF2200616 | HOWARD, CHERYL LYNN | 7/5/2022 | |||||||
LIGHTNING ROD MUTUAL vs HOWARD, CHERYL LYNN | |||||||||
CVG2200809 | MERGLER, TREVOR A | 7/5/2022 | |||||||
EVANS, STEPHANIE vs MERGLER, TREVOR A | |||||||||
CVG2200812 | ROBERSON, ALECIA | 7/5/2022 | |||||||
AUSTIN SPRINGS HOLDINGS, LLC vs ROBERSON, ALECIA | |||||||||
CVG2200814 | HENRY, CALEB | 7/5/2022 | |||||||
AUSTIN SPRINGS HOLDINGS LLC vs HENRY, CALEB | |||||||||
CVG2200823 | RICHRDS, TRE | 7/5/2022 | |||||||
EDWARD ROSE ASSOC., LLC vs RICHRDS, TRE | |||||||||
CVG2200824 | DAVIS, CLINT | 7/5/2022 | |||||||
EDWARD ROSE ASSOC. ,LLC vs DAVIS, CLINT | |||||||||
CVG2200827 | BEACHLER, TREASURE | 7/5/2022 | |||||||
RTB MAPLE RUN LLC vs BEACHLER, TREASURE | |||||||||
CVF2200556 | SHADE, STACY A | 7/5/2022 | |||||||
MYUSA CREDIT UNION INC vs SHADE, STACY A | |||||||||
CVG2200750 | TEAGUE, WILLIAM RAYMOND | 7/1/2022 | |||||||
FITE, ANDREW vs TEAGUE, WILLIAM RAYMOND | |||||||||
CVG2200795 | FLANNERY, KELLY | 6/29/2022 | |||||||
BAILEY, THOMAS vs FLANNERY, KELLY | |||||||||
CVI2200606 | LAMKIN, DANIELLE | 6/29/2022 | |||||||
SUPRENANT MD, RONALD vs LAMKIN, DANIELLE | |||||||||
CVE2101546 | COLE, CAROL | 6/28/2022 | |||||||
WASHINGTON, LATISHA L vs COLE, CAROL | |||||||||
CVF2101559 | STAPLETON, QUINESE | 6/28/2022 | |||||||
CITIBANK NA vs STAPLETON, QUINESE | |||||||||
CVF2200658 | HARRIS, MACKENZIE R | 6/28/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs HARRIS, MACKENZIE R | |||||||||
CVF2200690 | VAN ERT, ROGER L | 6/28/2022 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs VAN ERT, ROGER L | |||||||||
CVG2200629 | DRAPER LEWIS, MICHELLE | 6/28/2022 | |||||||
RICHTER, ROBERT M vs DRAPER LEWIS, MICHELLE | |||||||||
CVF2200214 | REED, COREY | 6/27/2022 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs REED, COREY | |||||||||
CVF2200396 | WOOD, SHERRIANN | 6/27/2022 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING LLC vs WOOD, SHERRIANN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 139, 140, 141 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |