Daily Law Journal
8755 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVG00215 CHRIS PACIFICO AND CARRIE PACIFICO 5/13/2014
ADAM BRYANT and HEATHER BRYANT vs CHRIS PACIFICO and CARRIE PACIFICO
13CVF01606 DENISE MICHAELS 5/13/2014
SYCAMORE COMMONS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION vs DENISE MICHAELS
14CVI00209 WILLIE J ABERNATHY 5/13/2014
SCHARMAINE ABERNATHY vs WILLIE J ABERNATHY
14CVI00469 SARAH METCALF 5/13/2014
INTERSTATE FORD BY TODD M LANGFORD vs SARAH METCALF
14CVI00308 ROBERT JOHNSON, PRES. RETAIL SPRINT CORP. 5/13/2014
L. JOHN HARTMANN vs ROBERT JOHNSON, PRES. RETAIL SPRINT CORP.
14CVG00414 DENNIS HALEY 5/12/2014
AH4R-OH, LLC vs DENNIS HALEY
14CVG00429 LANA FELTNER, ET AL. AND BRIAN FELTNER, ET AL. 5/12/2014
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION vs LANA FELTNER, ET AL. and BRIAN FELTNER, ET AL.
13CVF01543 JEREMY STRONG 5/9/2014
CHRISTA SCHROEDER vs JEREMY STRONG
13CVF01337 LINDA K. MESSELLING AND JAMES MESSELLING 5/7/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs LINDA K. MESSELLING and JAMES MESSELLING
14CVG00544 AMANDA HOWARD, ET AL 5/6/2014
THE CONIFERS APARTMENTS vs AMANDA HOWARD, ET AL
14CVG00537 TRENT O'HAIR, ET AL. 5/6/2014
MAD RIVER APARTMENTS vs TRENT O'HAIR, ET AL.
14CVG00536 ANDREA PERKINS, ET AL. 5/6/2014
K& E PROPERTY MANAGEMENT FOR MINSTREL PROPERTIES vs ANDREA PERKINS, ET AL.
07CVG01940 CHIP SHORT 5/6/2014
GINA PARADISE-WARNER vs CHIP SHORT
14CVG00560 DANA ALLRED, ET AL. AN JACOBY ROWLAND 5/6/2014
AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs DANA ALLRED, ET AL. an JACOBY ROWLAND
14CVG00559 ANDREW JONES, ET AL 5/6/2014
CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS vs ANDREW JONES, ET AL
14CVG00558 SEAN HENLEY, ET AL. 5/6/2014
AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs SEAN HENLEY, ET AL.
14CVG00557 SHERYL COLEMAN, ET AL 5/6/2014
CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS vs SHERYL COLEMAN, ET AL
14CVG00556 CHARLES JONES, ET AL. 5/6/2014
JAMES KILGORE vs CHARLES JONES, ET AL.
14CVG00554 STEVE HOBBS AND VICKI HOBBS 5/6/2014
ELIZABETH WEBB vs STEVE HOBBS and VICKI HOBBS

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 435, 436, 437, 438  Next