Daily Law Journal
6852 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
12CVG00864 JOSEPH WILLIAMS, ET AL. AND LILLIAN WILLIAMS, ET A... 6/4/2013
DANIEL FELLERS DBA FELLERS INVESTMENT PROP. vs JOSEPH WILLIAMS, ET AL. and LILLIAN WI...
12CVE01145 CORY A HARBARGER, A MINOR AND LESLIE NUGENT FKA LE... 6/4/2013
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COÿand JOSHUA A LAWRENCE and NICOLE R LAWRENCE vs CORY A HARBAR...
12CVG01674 DAWNN ROBINSON, ET AL. 6/4/2013
SANDRA K. LEASE and KEVIN J. THOMAS and CHRISTIAN J. THOMAS vs DAWNN ROBINSON, ET AL.
13CVG00770 RASHAWN JONES, ET AL 6/3/2013
CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTSÿ vs RASHAWN JONES, ET AL
13CVG00767 CHRISTOPHER KELHOFFER, ET AL 6/3/2013
CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTSÿ vs CHRISTOPHER KELHOFFER, ET AL
13CVF00506 MICHAEL GARRETT AND JUNE GARRETT 5/31/2013
DISCOVER BANKÿ vs MICHAEL GARRETT and JUNE GARRETT
13CVG00585 DEBRA TURNER, ET AL. AND CRANFORD ALLEN, ET AL. II 5/30/2013
GREENWOOD PROPERTY MANAGMENTÿ vs DEBRA TURNER, ET AL. and CRANFORD ALLEN, ET AL. II
13CVG00663 CRAIG BISHOP 5/30/2013
JOHN LAING vs CRAIG BISHOP
13CVG00752 CHERYL METZGER, ET AL 5/28/2013
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENTÿ vs CHERYL METZGER, ET AL
13CVG00608 RICHARD REYNOLDS, ET AL. 5/28/2013
TONY DIGIORGIO vs RICHARD REYNOLDS, ET AL.
13CVG00751 RALPH BOOP AND SHELLY MCKINNEY, ET AL 5/28/2013
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA MIAMISBURG BY THE MALL vs RALPH BOOP and SHELLY MCKINNEY, ET AL
13CVG00749 BRITTANY FLYNN,ET AL. 5/28/2013
MIR ALI vs BRITTANY FLYNN,ET AL.
13CVG00747 LETITIA DEBRILL, ET AL 5/28/2013
ARNOLD SMITH vs LETITIA DEBRILL, ET AL
13CVG00741 D. CHRISTOPHER ANGST, ET AL. 5/28/2013
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPÿ vs D. CHRISTOPHER ANGST, ET AL.
13CVG00740 SHERYL STITES, ET AL. AND RAYMOND STITES, ET AL. 5/28/2013
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATIONÿ vs SHERYL STITES, ET AL. and RAYMOND STITES, ET AL.
13CVG00764 GAYLIAN WHITE, ET AL 5/28/2013
CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTSÿ vs GAYLIAN WHITE, ET AL
13CVG00763 GARY HARMON 5/28/2013
CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTSÿ vs GARY HARMON
13CVG00762 JORGE ROBLEDO, ET AL 5/28/2013
CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTSÿ vs JORGE ROBLEDO, ET AL
13CVG00754 WILBUR MOBLEY, ET AL III 5/28/2013
MIR ALI vs WILBUR MOBLEY, ET AL III

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 330, 331, 332 ... 341, 342, 343  Next