12036 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVE00254 | JOHN HALL | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
THE DAYTON POWER AND LIGHT COMPA vs JOHN HALL | |||||||||
14CVF01820 | KAREN WEBB | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs KAREN WEBB | |||||||||
11CVF01781 | TIMOTHY NEWMAN AND SAMANTHA N NEWMAN | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs TIMOTHY NEWMAN AND SAMANTHA N NEWMAN | |||||||||
10CVH00477 | DAFINA C TAYLOR | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
MATRIX ACQUISITIONS, LLC C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs DAFINA C TAYLOR | |||||||||
08CVH00896 | STEPHANIE C. BOOTH | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF DISCOVER CARD vs STEPHANIE C. BOOTH | |||||||||
08CVH01022 | JEFF S. KALTER | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs JEFF S. KALTER | |||||||||
19CVI00548 | MOLLY T BOWLING | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
ADX CONSTRUCTION LLC vs MOLLY T BOWLING | |||||||||
10CVH01005 | CHRISTOPH M BAILEY | 7/19/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O MORGAN & POTTINGER P.S.C. vs CHRISTOPH M BAILEY | |||||||||
19CVG01044 | ELIZABETH BLACK AND ANNA SCHULTZ, AND ALL OTHERS | 7/19/2019 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APARTMENTS vs ELIZABETH BLACK AND ANNA SCHULTZ, A... | |||||||||
19CVG01052 | TRACIE BERRY, AND ALL OTHERS | 7/18/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE RIDGE TOWNHOMES, LLC vs TRACIE BERRY, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG01060 | TYNESHA THOMAS | 7/18/2019 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS. vs TYNESHA THOMAS | |||||||||
19CVG01047 | FIESTA VENTURES 1, INC. DBA QDOBA MEXICAN GRILL | 7/18/2019 | |||||||
BRIXMOR HOLDINGS 10 SPE, LLC C/0 BRIXMOR PROPERTY GROUP vs FIESTA VENTURES 1, INC. DB... | |||||||||
19CVI00167 | URBAN DOG DAY SPA | 7/17/2019 | |||||||
STACY HURLEY vs URBAN DOG DAY SPA | |||||||||
18CVF01983 | MADISON BEAR AKA MADISON BEAR | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs MADISON BEAR AKA MADISON BEAR | |||||||||
19CVG01063 | TRACIE EDWARDS, AND ALL OTHERS | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS. vs TRACIE EDWARDS, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG01064 | DAWN WILLIFORD, AND ALL OTHERS | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA THE VOYAGEUR vs DAWN WILLIFORD, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG01065 | MOUSSA GUEYE, AND ALL OTHERS | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA THE VOYAGEUR vs MOUSSA GUEYE, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG01066 | KELLY HOWARD NICK MARSALA, AND ALL OTHERS | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
BRG REALTY GROUP, LLC AGNT FOR: MIAMISBURG BY THE MALL vs KELLY HOWARD NICK MAR... | |||||||||
19CVG01067 | ZYONUA BLACK, AND ALL OTHERS | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
THE CONIFERS APARTMENTS vs ZYONUA BLACK, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 189, 190, 191 ... 600, 601, 602 Next |