Daily Law Journal
9714 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
18CVE00231 SYCAMORE WALK CONDO OWNERS' ASSOC., INC., AND TOWN... 3/26/2019
MOTORS INSURANCE CORP AND JEFF SCHMITT CHEVROLET, LTD vs SYCAMORE WALK CONDO OWNERS' ...
12CVH00028 NICOLE STEINER 3/26/2019
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs NICOLE STEINER
19CVF00025 EMILY CAMPBELL 3/26/2019
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs EMILY CAMPBELL
05CVH00881 JEFFREY P FISHER 3/26/2019
PALISADES COLLECTION LLC vs JEFFREY P FISHER
19CVG00342 K. SCOTT WHITE AND JESSICA WHITE AND ALL OTHERS 3/25/2019
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs K. SCOTT WHITE AND JESSICA WHITE AN...
19CVG00341 CURTIS SMITH AND ALL OTHERS 3/25/2019
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs CURTIS SMITH AND ALL OTHERS
19CVG00271 RACHEL Y HOSKINS AND ANTHONY J BEST 3/21/2019
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MGMT, LLC DBA OAKWOOD APARTMENTS vs RACHEL Y HOSKINS AND ANTHONY J ...
19CVG00318 JESSICA APPLEGATE AND ALL OTHERS 3/21/2019
CARLYN MOYER vs JESSICA APPLEGATE AND ALL OTHERS
18CVE01463 CHRISTINE JOHNSON 3/20/2019
GEORGE WALTERS vs CHRISTINE JOHNSON
19CVG00371 SHEA BRANCH AND ALL OTHERS 3/19/2019
FEQ PROPERTIES vs SHEA BRANCH AND ALL OTHERS
19CVG00370 DAN HUNTER AND TIFFANY HUNTER AND ALL OTHERS 3/19/2019
FEQ PROPERTIES vs DAN HUNTER and TIFFANY HUNTER AND ALL OTHERS
19CVG00368 WILLIAM WALLACE AND JATANA WALLACE, AND ALL OTHERS 3/19/2019
DEAN WRUCK vs WILLIAM WALLACE and JATANA WALLACE, AND ALL OTHERS
19CVG00356 FIESTA VENTURES 1, INC. DBA QDOBA MEXICAN GRILL 3/19/2019
BRIXMOR HOLDINGS 10 SPE, LLC C/O BRIXMOR PROPERTY GROUP vs FIESTA VENTURES 1, INC. DB...
19CVG00346 MARGARET HOUSE AND ALL OTHERS 3/19/2019
CMC PROPERTIES vs MARGARET HOUSE AND ALL OTHERS
19CVG00345 ALLAN ORELLANA AND LILIANA GARCIA AND ALL OTHERS 3/19/2019
CMC PROPERTIES vs ALLAN ORELLANA and LILIANA GARCIA AND ALL OTHERS
19CVI00157 SHANTELL WILSON 3/19/2019
JEREMY SINGLETON vs SHANTELL WILSON
19CVI00143 WESTERN RESERVE GROUP C/O MARK DOUNTZ 3/19/2019
GLORIA J GREENLEE vs WESTERN RESERVE GROUP C/O MARK DOUNTZ
18CVF01881 PRESERVE AT SAGEBROOK C/O ANNA CHANLEY 3/19/2019
EBERECHI AKOMA vs PRESERVE AT SAGEBROOK C/O ANNA CHANLEY
19CVG00376 JORDAN BAIR AND KELLIN DUNLAFF, AND ALL OTHERS 3/19/2019
TONYA BAIR and BAIR SLOTH vs JORDAN BAIR and KELLIN DUNLAFF, AND ALL OTHERS

Previous  1, 2, 3, ... 484, 485, 486  Next