12036 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVI01477 | MICHAEL A BLACKSON | 12/13/2016 | |||||||
AMY STUVEN vs MICHAEL A BLACKSON | |||||||||
16CVI00411 | LEE DELEHANTY MELISSA ELLIOTT-DELEHANTY | 12/13/2016 | |||||||
ANDREA SZABADOS vs LEE DELEHANTY MELISSA ELLIOTT-DELEHANTY | |||||||||
16CVF00948 | ROBERT B SULLIVAN ANGELA D. SULLIVAN | 12/13/2016 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC INC vs ROBERT B SULLIVAN ANGELA D. SULLIVAN | |||||||||
15CVF01469 | CHRISTOPHER E LAMB | 12/13/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE L vs CHRISTOPHER E LAMB | |||||||||
16CVI00816 | MARK GUNDELFINGER | 12/13/2016 | |||||||
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, INC. C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs MARK GUNDELFINGER | |||||||||
15CVF00967 | ANNETTA NEWTON | 12/13/2016 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS INC. vs ANNETTA NEWTON | |||||||||
15CVF00214 | ROBERT RECK (R&S MOBILE HOME PARK) SHAWN MATLOCK | 12/13/2016 | |||||||
ROBYN N. MATLOCK vs ROBERT RECK (R&S MOBILE HOME PARK) SHAWN MATLOCK | |||||||||
16CVI01469 | MARGARET WOELFEL SCOTT WOELFEL | 12/13/2016 | |||||||
COURTENEY B HUFF vs MARGARET WOELFEL SCOTT WOELFEL | |||||||||
16CVG01585 | BRANDON HOGLAND, ET. AL | 12/12/2016 | |||||||
ROBERT J. RECK vs BRANDON HOGLAND, ET. AL | |||||||||
15CVF01669 | 12/10/2016 | ||||||||
CBCS vs | |||||||||
10CVH00522 | STEPHANIE BRANDENBURG | 12/9/2016 | |||||||
PRECISION RECOVERY ANALYTICS INC FKA COLLINS FINANCIAL SERVICES I vs STEPHANIE BRANDE... | |||||||||
16CVG01602 | KARLA HAUFFMAN, ET AL. | 12/8/2016 | |||||||
GLENN HIATT vs KARLA HAUFFMAN, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG01607 | JOSHUA EDWARDS, ET. AL | 12/8/2016 | |||||||
ALMEDIA COURT, LLC DBA MIAMISBURG GARDENS vs JOSHUA EDWARDS, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01608 | CORY PALMISANO, ET. AL CHRISTINA PALMISANO, ET. AL | 12/8/2016 | |||||||
ALMEDIA COURT, LLC DBA MIAMISBURG GARDENS vs CORY PALMISANO, ET. AL CHRISTINA PALMISA... | |||||||||
16CVG01621 | LISA DISMUKE, ET AL. | 12/8/2016 | |||||||
THE CONIFERS APARTMENTS vs LISA DISMUKE, ET AL. | |||||||||
09CVE02416 | JONATHAN J. HEMBREE | 12/8/2016 | |||||||
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY THOMAS H. FOGT vs JONATHAN J. HEMBREE | |||||||||
16CVF01086 | 12/7/2016 | ||||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs | |||||||||
16CVF00603 | 12/6/2016 | ||||||||
LIN TELEVISION CORPORATION vs | |||||||||
16CVG01623 | 12/6/2016 | ||||||||
DONNA KAY WALTERS vs | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 582, 583, 584 ... 600, 601, 602 Next |