12036 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVI01733 | AIMEE MCFARLAND | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
PAUL SALMONS vs AIMEE MCFARLAND | |||||||||
17CVG00375 | FIRAS ABUAMREH, ET AL. AND DIMA ABUAMREH, ET AL. A... | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
KELLY M. ABUAMREH vs FIRAS ABUAMREH, ET AL. and DIMA ABUAMREH, ET AL. a... | |||||||||
17CVF00060 | RAED M. ALKHASAWNEH, AKA RAED MOHAMMAD A | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs RAED M. ALKHASAWNEH, AKA RA... | |||||||||
05CVH02073 | ALICE M BROCKMAN AND GALAXY PORTFOLIOS, LLC | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASIN vs ALICE M BROCKMAN and GALAXY PORTFOLIOS, LLC | |||||||||
16CVE00925 | EMILY BOGAN | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
GBOLAHAN ODULATE vs EMILY BOGAN | |||||||||
17CVI00182 | LEEANNA M. RUE | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
GERALD E GUNNOE vs LEEANNA M. RUE | |||||||||
16CVG01288 | COURTNEY DUCCESCHI, ET. AL AND JOAN RIESS | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
GEORGE RIESS vs COURTNEY DUCCESCHI, ET. AL and JOAN RIESS | |||||||||
16CVE01777 | ELLEN DUDLEY | 3/31/2017 | |||||||
PAUL SLAGLE vs ELLEN DUDLEY | |||||||||
17CVG00374 | CHRISTOPHER R. TRIM, ET AL. AND TAMARA L. DORNON, ... | 3/30/2017 | |||||||
FARMERS, LTD vs CHRISTOPHER R. TRIM, ET AL. and TAMARA L. DORNON, ... | |||||||||
16CVF01833 | KIMBERLY S. BANKS | 3/29/2017 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO, INC., vs KIMBERLY S. BANKS | |||||||||
16CVI01445 | DON JAMES | 3/28/2017 | |||||||
RICK JOHN vs DON JAMES | |||||||||
17CVG00191 | SAM OAKLAIN, ET. AL; AKA SAMUEL GEOR | 3/28/2017 | |||||||
BROOKLYNN GROVE vs SAM OAKLAIN, ET. AL; AKA SAMUEL GEOR | |||||||||
17CVI00219 | CHRIS LANNARD AND JAMES MCLEAN | 3/28/2017 | |||||||
L. JOHN HARTMANN vs CHRIS LANNARD and JAMES MCLEAN | |||||||||
17CVG00426 | LISA DISMUKE, ET AL. | 3/28/2017 | |||||||
THE CONIFERS APARTMENTS vs LISA DISMUKE, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG00399 | JAMES LAKES, ET. AL | 3/28/2017 | |||||||
RAYMOND JOHNSTON, DBA RTJ PROPERTIES LLC. vs JAMES LAKES, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00390 | TOM WEEKS, ET AL. | 3/28/2017 | |||||||
R&S RECK MHD vs TOM WEEKS, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG00389 | SARA MORGAN, ET AL. | 3/28/2017 | |||||||
R & S RECK MHD vs SARA MORGAN, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG00387 | JAMES SORRELL, ET AL. | 3/28/2017 | |||||||
R&S RECK MHP vs JAMES SORRELL, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG00380 | JORDAN MORRIS, ET. AL | 3/28/2017 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC. DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs JORDAN MORRIS, ET. AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 564, 565, 566 ... 600, 601, 602 Next |