12036 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVG00581 | JASON SARVER, ET. AL | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs JASON SARVER, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVE01572 | ANDRE M. LEWIS & DAVID E. BARTELS | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
OBED NKURIAGENDA vs ANDRE M. LEWIS & DAVID E. BARTELS | |||||||||
17CVI00083 | DAVID L. CRUM | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
GERALD GUNNOE vs DAVID L. CRUM | |||||||||
16CVI01358 | MAURICE ROBINSON | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
VIRGINIA E. LYNN vs MAURICE ROBINSON | |||||||||
16CVF01036 | DUANE YOUNG | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs DUANE YOUNG | |||||||||
13CVF00910 | JOHNIECE WOODWARD | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs JOHNIECE WOODWARD | |||||||||
11CVH01599 | SIERRA RATLIFF | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER DBA SYCAMORE HOSPITAL vs SIERRA RATLIFF | |||||||||
17CVI00394 | ELVIN (AUSTIN) R. BOWMAN | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
JAMES CULLERS vs ELVIN (AUSTIN) R. BOWMAN | |||||||||
17CVI00379 | TAJUL (JOE) PORDAN DBA MOBILE MEDICS | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
ANTONIO GREEN & SHAKIYLA GREEN FOSTER vs TAJUL (JOE) PORDAN DBA MOBILE MEDICS | |||||||||
17CVG00595 | ANGIE TAYLOR, ET. AL | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
DAVID L. HAMBY vs ANGIE TAYLOR, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00594 | RICHARD R. BARNHART II, ET. AL & MARGARET E. BARNH... | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
GERALD WERLING & TONYA L. WERLING vs RICHARD R. BARNHART II, ET. AL & MARGARET E. BAR... | |||||||||
17CVG00592 | ROBERT HUDNALL, ET AL. | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs ROBERT HUDNALL, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG00591 | BELINDA BAKER, ET AL. | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
PEDCOR INVESTMENTS-1996-XXVI L.P. DBA LYONS GATE APARTMENTS vs BELINDA BAKER, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG00590 | TARA A. ALLEN | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
JON BUCHER vs TARA A. ALLEN | |||||||||
17CVG00580 | JAMES WILSON, ET. AL | 5/2/2017 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs JAMES WILSON, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00472 | CHAD EVERETTS, ET. AL | 4/28/2017 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LL DBA CARROLLTON POINTE APARTMENTS vs CHAD EVERETTS, E... | |||||||||
17CVG00531 | MATTHEW WOODARD, ET AL. &JAIME WOODARD, ET AL. | 4/27/2017 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC. DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs MATTHEW WOODARD, ET AL. &JAIME WOO... | |||||||||
17CVF00361 | 4/26/2017 | ||||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs | |||||||||
17CVG00543 | 4/25/2017 | ||||||||
R&S RECK MHP vs | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 559, 560, 561 ... 600, 601, 602 Next |