12036 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVG01703 | MIKE LYNN, ET AL AND MICHELLE SPURLOCK, ET AL | 10/3/2017 | |||||||
O.L. GARRISON vs MIKE LYNN, ET AL and MICHELLE SPURLOCK, ET AL | |||||||||
17CVG00989 | GARY HAND, ET AL. AND EBONY HAND, ET. AL | 10/3/2017 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC. DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs GARY HAND, ET AL. and EBONY HAND, ... | |||||||||
17CVG01192 | DAVID JEWELL, ET. AL | 10/3/2017 | |||||||
ROBERT RECK vs DAVID JEWELL, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01444 | LARRY ALTHOUSE AND MEGAN ALTHOUSE | 10/3/2017 | |||||||
ART PARADISE, INC. vs LARRY ALTHOUSE and MEGAN ALTHOUSE | |||||||||
15CVF00820 | DOUGLAS CORCORAN | 10/3/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs DOUGLAS CORCORAN | |||||||||
17CVF00457 | ROGER D. LUNSFORD | 9/29/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC ASSIGNEE OF U.S. BANK NATIONAL A vs ROGER D. LUNSFORD | |||||||||
17CVG01340 | TIMOTHY R. HATFIELD, ET. AL AND MARICHU HATFIELD, ... | 9/28/2017 | |||||||
WENDY BAKER AND DANIEL BAKER vs TIMOTHY R. HATFIELD, ET. AL AND MARICHU HATFIELD, ... | |||||||||
17CVH01090 | MONT CO ANIMAL RESOURCE | 9/27/2017 | |||||||
ANDREA BRANSCOMB vs MONT CO ANIMAL RESOURCE | |||||||||
17CVG01440 | PHYLLIS MARKER, ET AL. | 9/26/2017 | |||||||
CANDLEWOOD VILLAGE OF GERMANTOWN, LLC. vs PHYLLIS MARKER, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01439 | BRUNO KAVUTSE, ET AL. | 9/26/2017 | |||||||
EAGLE RIDGE TOWNHOMES, LLC SIIT SUNDANCE PROPERTY MGMT. INC vs BRUNO KAVUTSE, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01438 | AUSTON M. TAYLOR, ET AL. AND AUSTIN S. DAVIS, ET A... | 9/26/2017 | |||||||
EAGLE RIDGE TOWNHOMES, LLC SIIT SUNDANCE PROPERTY MGMT. INC vs AUSTON M. TAYLOR, ET A... | |||||||||
17CVG01436 | NICOLE D. WATSON, ET AL. | 9/26/2017 | |||||||
EAGLE RIDGE TOWNHOMES, LLC SIIT SUNDANCE PROPERTY MGMT., IN vs NICOLE D. WATSON, ET A... | |||||||||
17CVG01432 | JAMES SORRELL, ET AL. | 9/26/2017 | |||||||
ROBERT J. RECK vs JAMES SORRELL, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01427 | ROSIE STETHEM, ET AL. | 9/26/2017 | |||||||
ROBERT J. RECK vs ROSIE STETHEM, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01424 | TINA STAMM, ET AL. | 9/26/2017 | |||||||
ROBERT J. RECK vs TINA STAMM, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01417 | EMIKO FOLEY, ET AL. | 9/26/2017 | |||||||
GAWAIN CIRCLE,LP vs EMIKO FOLEY, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01415 | TINA PROFFIT, ET AL. | 9/26/2017 | |||||||
GWEN SARGENT vs TINA PROFFIT, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01413 | DOMINIC CLARK, ET AL. | 9/26/2017 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON PREMIER MGMT vs DOMINIC CLARK, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01409 | ROSANN PINKERTON, ET. AL | 9/26/2017 | |||||||
TANYA M. STRAIGHT vs ROSANN PINKERTON, ET. AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 535, 536, 537 ... 600, 601, 602 Next |