12036 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVV00116 | DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 12/15/2017 | |||||||
JOHN C ELLIS Jr. vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
17CVF03224 | ANITA DHAUL | 12/15/2017 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, P.C. vs ANITA DHAUL | |||||||||
17CVV00121 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 12/14/2017 | |||||||
KRISTEN LEMON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
17CVV00127 | DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 12/14/2017 | |||||||
JENNIFER DINE vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
17CVI01312 | LOUIS CAMPBELL | 12/13/2017 | |||||||
PAULINE STACY GARY STACY vs LOUIS CAMPBELL | |||||||||
17CVF00938 | GARY L. NUNN | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs GARY L. NUNN | |||||||||
17CVF00073 | LORI A. CROUCH | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs LORI A. CROUCH | |||||||||
17CVF01111 | GARY CHURCHILL | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
TIMOTHY STIFFLER vs GARY CHURCHILL | |||||||||
17CVI01741 | CHARLES CODE KEITH | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
LINDA SWARTZ vs CHARLES CODE KEITH | |||||||||
17CVI01123 | PAYLESS FURNITURE & MATTRESSES | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
ANNETTE FRAZIER vs PAYLESS FURNITURE & MATTRESSES | |||||||||
17CVG00962 | CARMEN KIRKPATRICK, ET. AL TRENTON KIRKPATRICK... | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA COVEY RUN APARTMENTS vs CARMEN KIRKPATRICK, ET. ... | |||||||||
17CVI01629 | AYANNA BROWN | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
COMPETITIVE EDGE ATHLETICS, INC. vs AYANNA BROWN | |||||||||
17CVI01626 | BRANDY NICOLE GAYHEART | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
COMPETITIVE EDGE ATHLETICS, INC. vs BRANDY NICOLE GAYHEART | |||||||||
17CVI01245 | JENNIFER JORGERSER | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
NATURECRAFT PRODUCTS INC. C/O DEAN O'NEAL vs JENNIFER JORGERSER | |||||||||
16CVE00863 | CHAD MILLER | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
THE DAYTON POWER AND LIGHT COMPA vs CHAD MILLER | |||||||||
16CVF01682 | ANNETTE GRIFFIN, AKA ANNETTE M BERGER | 12/5/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs ANNETTE GRIFFIN, AKA ANNETTE M BERGER | |||||||||
08CVG00024 | LESLIE NORTH AND JESSIE FINDLEY AND MARIE BOZEMAN | 12/5/2017 | |||||||
ART PARADISE vs LESLIE NORTH AND JESSIE FINDLEY AND MARIE BOZEMAN | |||||||||
17CVG01833 | TERRANCE BROWN, ET AL. | 12/5/2017 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APARTMENTS vs TERRANCE BROWN, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG01835 | ROBERT DREW AND KAYLA LAYTON, AND ALL OTHERS | 12/5/2017 | |||||||
EDWARD ROSE ASSO INC DBA AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs ROBERT DREW AND KAYLA LAYTON, AND... | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 521, 522, 523 ... 600, 601, 602 Next |