20839 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF02605 | RONALD C COLOMBE III | 4/5/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs RONALD C COLOMBE III | |||||||||
19CVF02591 | MICHEL BUXTON | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs MICHEL BUXTON | |||||||||
19CVF02592 | MICHEL BUXTON | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs MICHEL BUXTON | |||||||||
19CVF02593 | BRANDON P SMITH | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs BRANDON P SMITH | |||||||||
19CVF02594 | EILEEM J CASTOR | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs EILEEM J CASTOR | |||||||||
19CVF02595 | TINA MARIE MISNER | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA NA vs TINA MARIE MISNER | |||||||||
19CVF02596 | TYLER KILBY | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
IH CREDIT UNION vs TYLER KILBY | |||||||||
19CVF02597 | ZACHARY MICHAEL NAUGLE | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC vs ZACHARY MICHAEL NAUGLE | |||||||||
19CVF02598 | MELISSA A RANKIN | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs MELISSA A RANKIN | |||||||||
19CVF02585 | JANICE M MADDUX | 4/3/2019 | |||||||
CITIBANK NA vs JANICE M MADDUX | |||||||||
19CVF02590 | STEPHEN HARNESS | 4/3/2019 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND LP vs STEPHEN HARNESS | |||||||||
19CVF02589 | F&S SCHOOL & OFFICE SUPPLIES LLC | 4/3/2019 | |||||||
TOP NOTCH TEACHER PRODUCTS INC vs F&S SCHOOL & OFFICE SUPPLIES LLC | |||||||||
19CVF02588 | KENDALL J DEBORD | 4/3/2019 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET vs KENDALL J DEBORD | |||||||||
19CVF02587 | CHESLSEA PANNELL | 4/3/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs CHESLSEA PANNELL | |||||||||
19CVF02586 | VICTOR ROONEY | 4/3/2019 | |||||||
GLENN J. JIVIDEN, JR., D.D.S. IN vs VICTOR ROONEY | |||||||||
19CVF02584 | JOSHUA BENNETT | 4/3/2019 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC vs JOSHUA BENNETT | |||||||||
19CVF02575 | MICHAEL A HATTON | 4/2/2019 | |||||||
RAHN DENTAL GROUP INC vs MICHAEL A HATTON | |||||||||
19CVF02572 | MARIAN ROSENBERG | 4/1/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs MARIAN ROSENBERG | |||||||||
19CVF02576 | SUE C HAMMERGREN | 4/1/2019 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs SUE C HAMMERGREN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 497, 498, 499 ... 1040, 1041, 1042 Next |