Daily Law Journal
10908 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVI00241 MARIE CASELLA 3/20/2013
OAKWOOD LAWN & LANDSCAPING CO IN vs MARIE CASELLA
13CVG00238 AMANDA STIDHAM 3/19/2013
SUE HULTON vs AMANDA STIDHAM
13CVV00039 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO 3/19/2013
RALPH REIDELL III vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO
13CVF00236 GARY ROHRBACK 3/18/2013
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs GARY ROHRBACK
13CVF00237 RONNIE GEHRING 3/18/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs RONNIE GEHRING
13CVV00038 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES FRANKLIN CALTRIDER, ... 3/18/2013
ADAM UNGER vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES FRANKLIN CALTRIDER, ...
13CVF00234 MATTHEW OLINGER 3/15/2013
HEARTLAND FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs MATTHEW OLINGER
13CVI00232 CLEAN CAR INC 3/15/2013
TINA WERTS vs CLEAN CAR INC
13CVI00233 LISA CACCAMO 3/15/2013
SHELLEY H WAGSHUL vs LISA CACCAMO
13CVI00235 ANDREA WATTS 3/15/2013
LARRY JAFFE vs ANDREA WATTS
13CVV00037 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 3/14/2013
ELIZABETH EVERETT vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...
13CVF00231 STEVE TAYLOR 3/14/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs STEVE TAYLOR
13CVI00230 HEATHER MACQUARRIE 3/14/2013
MICHAEL DIXON vs HEATHER MACQUARRIE
13CVV00036 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 3/14/2013
MELANIE VAN ATTA vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
13CVE00228 DAIVD V MATHENY 3/13/2013
ALLSTATE PROPERTY & CASUALTY IN vs DAIVD V MATHENY
13CVI00229 DONNA WRAY 3/13/2013
SELLERS LAWN CARE INC vs DONNA WRAY
13CVV00035 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 3/13/2013
MICHAEL ORMOND vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
13CVV00034 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 3/12/2013
RYAN P WOODIE vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
13CVF00221 MOLLY STEVENSON 3/11/2013
TOWNE PROPERTIES ASSET MGMT DBA REVERE VILLAGE vs MOLLY STEVENSON

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 474, 475, 476 ... 544, 545, 546  Next