20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVG03034 | MICHELLE CAMPBELL | 6/12/2019 | |||||||
MOJODAY, LLC vs MICHELLE CAMPBELL | |||||||||
19CVF03022 | MARIA FIGUEROA | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs MARIA FIGUEROA | |||||||||
19CVF03023 | AMANDA MELANSON | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs AMANDA MELANSON | |||||||||
19CVF03049 | STEWART PETERS | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs STEWART PETERS | |||||||||
19CVF03050 | QUYEN LUU | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs QUYEN LUU | |||||||||
19CVG03021 | ANTHONY BEST | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
KETTERING RES, LLC vs ANTHONY BEST | |||||||||
19CVG03032 | JULIA YOUNGERMAN | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
NADER GIRGIS vs JULIA YOUNGERMAN | |||||||||
19CVE03020 | PRESHIA N GRIFFIN | 6/10/2019 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs PRESHIA N GRIFFIN | |||||||||
19CVG03018 | KENYATTA RHAMES | 6/10/2019 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, LLC vs KENYATTA RHAMES | |||||||||
19CVG03019 | CHASITY REED | 6/10/2019 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, LLC vs CHASITY REED | |||||||||
19CVV00033 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 6/7/2019 | |||||||
STEPHAN D MCKOWEN vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
19CVF03017 | RIAD SHUMAN | 6/6/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs RIAD SHUMAN | |||||||||
19CVG03016 | ALLEN VAUGHN | 6/6/2019 | |||||||
STEPHANIE JACKSON vs ALLEN VAUGHN | |||||||||
19CVF03005 | MARTHA L GREER | 6/5/2019 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs MARTHA L GREER | |||||||||
19CVF03006 | DENIESE N DOVE | 6/5/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs DENIESE N DOVE | |||||||||
19CVF03007 | EMILY N MORTOR | 6/5/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs EMILY N MORTOR | |||||||||
19CVF03008 | ANDREW L SCHAADE | 6/5/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs ANDREW L SCHAADE | |||||||||
19CVF03009 | STEVEN V GRABEMAN | 6/5/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs STEVEN V GRABEMAN | |||||||||
19CVF03010 | MICHAEL MILLS | 6/5/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs MICHAEL MILLS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 473, 474, 475 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |