Daily Law Journal
10769 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVG00246 SCOTT SORTMAN 3/20/2013
JIYOUNG HUR vs SCOTT SORTMAN
13CVI00239 RYAN BEAM 3/20/2013
BENJAMIN M JONES vs RYAN BEAM
13CVF00243 LINDSEY GLOWNEY 3/20/2013
CBCS vs LINDSEY GLOWNEY
13CVI00241 MARIE CASELLA 3/20/2013
OAKWOOD LAWN & LANDSCAPING CO IN vs MARIE CASELLA
13CVF00244 NEVIN SMITH 3/20/2013
CAPERNA FAMILY LIMITED PARTNER SHIP vs NEVIN SMITH
13CVF00245 PAUL LUTE 3/20/2013
CAPERNA FAMILY LIMITED PARTNER SHIP vs PAUL LUTE
13CVG00240 JAMES PLEASON 3/20/2013
J.L ZIMMERMAN REALTY AGENT FOR OWNER VIRGIL BROWN vs JAMES PLEASON
13CVG00242 MELANIE BARNES 3/20/2013
FRED DEATON vs MELANIE BARNES
13CVG00238 AMANDA STIDHAM 3/19/2013
SUE HULTON vs AMANDA STIDHAM
13CVV00039 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO 3/19/2013
RALPH REIDELL III vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO
13CVF00237 RONNIE GEHRING 3/18/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs RONNIE GEHRING
13CVV00038 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES FRANKLIN CALTRIDER, ... 3/18/2013
ADAM UNGER vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES FRANKLIN CALTRIDER, ...
13CVF00236 GARY ROHRBACK 3/18/2013
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs GARY ROHRBACK
13CVF00234 MATTHEW OLINGER 3/15/2013
HEARTLAND FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs MATTHEW OLINGER
13CVI00232 CLEAN CAR INC 3/15/2013
TINA WERTS vs CLEAN CAR INC
13CVI00233 LISA CACCAMO 3/15/2013
SHELLEY H WAGSHUL vs LISA CACCAMO
13CVI00235 ANDREA WATTS 3/15/2013
LARRY JAFFE vs ANDREA WATTS
13CVI00230 HEATHER MACQUARRIE 3/14/2013
MICHAEL DIXON vs HEATHER MACQUARRIE
13CVV00036 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 3/14/2013
MELANIE VAN ATTA vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 466, 467, 468 ... 537, 538, 539  Next