Daily Law Journal
10769 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVV00046 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO 3/27/2013
SARA M BOAZ vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO
13CVF00265 ANDREA WAGNER 3/27/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs ANDREA WAGNER
13CVG00258 CHRISTOPHER JONES 3/27/2013
C F L PROPERTIES vs CHRISTOPHER JONES
13CVI00259 REBECCA OVERMAN 3/27/2013
LAMANNA'S LAWN & LANDSCAPING vs REBECCA OVERMAN
13CVF00255 PAMELA J DUNCAN 3/26/2013
DON WRIGHT REALTY, LLC vs PAMELA J DUNCAN
13CVI00254 CHRISTJOEL MOORE 3/26/2013
TRAILS OF OAK CREEK vs CHRISTJOEL MOORE
13CVI00256 SARA RONDTHALER 3/26/2013
HEATHER A LAY vs SARA RONDTHALER
13CVF00252 LATISHA TOGAN 3/25/2013
TENDER LOVING CHILDCARE CENTER LLC vs LATISHA TOGAN
13CVF00253 BRANDON C GREINER 3/25/2013
CORNERSTONE GOVERNOURS SQUARE LT DBA GOVERNOURS SQUARE vs BRANDON C GREINER
13CVG00248 ROBIN D. COOTS 3/25/2013
DEARWESTER'S GEM CITY ESTATES INC vs ROBIN D. COOTS
13CVG00249 STEVEN TANKERSLEY JR. 3/25/2013
DEARWESTER'S GEM CITY ESTATES INC vs STEVEN TANKERSLEY Jr.
13CVV00045 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV 3/25/2013
JASON C WENNER vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV
13CVF00250 AMER MUSTAFA 3/25/2013
MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL vs AMER MUSTAFA
13CVF00251 NAKAI BURNS 3/25/2013
TENDER LOVING CHILDCARE CENTER LLC vs NAKAI BURNS
13CVG00247 HERLINDA LEIBOVITCH 3/22/2013
TD PROPERTIES vs HERLINDA LEIBOVITCH
13CVV00044 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 3/22/2013
DYLAN WANKE vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
13CVV00040 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 3/21/2013
TROY MAGERS vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...
13CVV00041 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 3/21/2013
THOMAS A HARTING vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
13CVV00042 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 3/21/2013
JOHN OGG vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 465, 466, 467 ... 537, 538, 539  Next