20817 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVG03770 | STEPHANIE NISWONGER | 9/20/2019 | |||||||
PLUM TREE REALTY, LLC AGENT FOR WILLIAM FURLONG vs STEPHANIE NISWONGER | |||||||||
19CVI03771 | NATASHA N FALL | 9/20/2019 | |||||||
JOHN P SANDERS Sr. vs NATASHA N FALL | |||||||||
19CVG03759 | ELLEN GERHARDT | 9/20/2019 | |||||||
TERRACES SENIOR APARTMENTS, L.P. vs ELLEN GERHARDT | |||||||||
19CVG03743 | MATTHEW LEWIS | 9/19/2019 | |||||||
DUVAL DEVELOPMENT, LLC vs MATTHEW LEWIS | |||||||||
19CVI03756 | MICHAEL SMITH | 9/19/2019 | |||||||
MICHAEL LOVANO vs MICHAEL SMITH | |||||||||
19CVF03769 | KAREN THERIAULT | 9/18/2019 | |||||||
UHG I LLC vs KAREN THERIAULT | |||||||||
19CVF03768 | JUSTIN YOUNG | 9/18/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs JUSTIN YOUNG | |||||||||
19CVF03767 | KAREN E PURVIS | 9/18/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs KAREN E PURVIS | |||||||||
19CVF03766 | MICHAEL MESSER | 9/18/2019 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET vs MICHAEL MESSER | |||||||||
19CVF03765 | JASON E MANDRY | 9/18/2019 | |||||||
FC FUNDING, LLC vs JASON E MANDRY | |||||||||
19CVF03764 | HEATHER M SMITH | 9/18/2019 | |||||||
FC FUNDING, LLC vs HEATHER M SMITH | |||||||||
19CVF03761 | SHANNON M SELLARS | 9/17/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs SHANNON M SELLARS | |||||||||
19CVF03762 | NORMA SHOOK | 9/17/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs NORMA SHOOK | |||||||||
19CVG03734 | ASHLEY WILLIAMS | 9/17/2019 | |||||||
MIMG XXVIII HERITAGE SUB, LLC vs ASHLEY WILLIAMS | |||||||||
19CVG03735 | KIMBERLY ELLIOTT | 9/17/2019 | |||||||
FOX HUNT OWNER, LLC vs KIMBERLY ELLIOTT | |||||||||
19CVG03736 | CALVIN BROWN | 9/17/2019 | |||||||
FOX HUNT OWNER, LLC vs CALVIN BROWN | |||||||||
19CVE03757 | PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY | 9/16/2019 | |||||||
CHERYL OLYNYK vs PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY | |||||||||
19CVF03747 | JENNIFER JONES | 9/16/2019 | |||||||
THOMAS SCHIFF vs JENNIFER JONES | |||||||||
19CVF03748 | TRAVIS WILKINS JR. | 9/16/2019 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs TRAVIS WILKINS Jr. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 437, 438, 439 ... 1039, 1040, 1041 Next |