Daily Law Journal
9029 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
12CVG02687 TRACY R LAKES 6/13/2012
DON THOMAS vs TRACY R LAKES
12CVG02688 NATE UNVERFERTH 6/13/2012
BRUNILDA VELEZ vs NATE UNVERFERTH
12CVV00119 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 6/13/2012
BETTY DIANE BARTRAM vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
12CVV00118 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 6/12/2012
CARL S HALL II vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
12CVF02682 CRAIG BURNHAM 6/11/2012
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O LEVY & ACCOC., LLC vs CRAIG BURNHAM
12CVF02676 TIM F MC KELVEY 6/11/2012
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA vs TIM F MC KELVEY
12CVF02683 JOHN HOWARD 6/11/2012
CREDIT INVESTMENTS, INC vs JOHN HOWARD
12CVF02677 JOHN M DELAY 6/11/2012
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs JOHN M DELAY
12CVF02684 JAMES H GEIGER SR. 6/11/2012
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O LEVY & ACCOC., LLC vs JAMES H GEIGER Sr.
12CVF02678 LARRY CRAYCRAFT 6/11/2012
CCS GROUP, LLC vs LARRY CRAYCRAFT
12CVF02679 MELISSA J HOBBS 6/11/2012
WILLIAM R DORSEY, DO vs MELISSA J HOBBS
12CVF02680 ELLA S MILLER 6/11/2012
MSW CAPITAL LLC vs ELLA S MILLER
12CVF02681 RION CALDWELL 6/11/2012
LVNV FUNDING, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs RION CALDWELL
12CVE02685 LOGAN T LANSANGAN 6/11/2012
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs LOGAN T LANSANGAN
12CVF02674 CHRISTIE L MANTIA 6/8/2012
CAVALRY SPV I LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES vs CHRISTIE L MANTIA
12CVG02673 MARGARET BROOKS 6/8/2012
MICHAEL B MCGUIRE vs MARGARET BROOKS
12CVI02675 THOMAS BRUNSWICK 6/8/2012
CHARLES DIPASQUALE vs THOMAS BRUNSWICK
12CVV00117 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES 6/8/2012
BENJAMIN M ZELINSKAS vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES
12CVE02672 ERIKA N PERRY 6/7/2012
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INSURANCE CO. vs ERIKA N PERRY

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 433, 434, 435 ... 450, 451, 452  Next