Daily Law Journal
10302 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVV00073 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV 4/30/2013
MATTHEW T BUSSEN vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV
13CVV00074 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 4/30/2013
JEFFREY MONTGOMERY vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
13CVF00348 TRISHA PAYTON 4/30/2013
VAUGHN GROUP LTD DBA CHATHAM VILLAGE C/O RACHEL J vs TRISHA PAYTON
13CVF00349 LISA M MCCOY 4/30/2013
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs LISA M MCCOY
13CVG00347 SHEENA JOHNSON 4/29/2013
DOVETREE APARTMENTS vs SHEENA JOHNSON
13CVI00346 OMER KODI 4/29/2013
YOUSIF LAMBI vs OMER KODI
13CVV00072 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 4/29/2013
KEVIN E GUM vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
13CVE00343 KEVIN J WATERS 4/29/2013
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE CO. vs KEVIN J WATERS
13CVF00342 SHERRI RAJCHEL 4/29/2013
PRIME ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION C/O RACHEL J MASON/ATTY vs SHERRI RAJCHEL
13CVF00344 ANNA M PEARMAN 4/29/2013
RETAIL RECOVERY SERVICE OF NJ IN vs ANNA M PEARMAN
13CVF00345 KENNETH W DAVIS 4/29/2013
RETAIL RECOVERY SERVICE OF NJ IN vs KENNETH W DAVIS
13CVG00340 DANIEL CURRENT 4/26/2013
ARBORVILLE INVESTMENTS vs DANIEL CURRENT
13CVG00341 JULIE PRICE 4/26/2013
VITAYA NINLAWONG vs JULIE PRICE
13CVG00337 GINGER STROOP 4/25/2013
DOUGLAS H ENGBERSON vs GINGER STROOP
13CVI00338 JAMES BARON 4/25/2013
TIMOTHY PEDRO vs JAMES BARON
13CVF00339 MARK DELL 4/25/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs MARK DELL
13CVE00335 MICHAEL D HARRIS 4/24/2013
DEBORAH WRIGHT vs MICHAEL D HARRIS
13CVF00334 JOHN KEREKESH 4/24/2013
CBCS vs JOHN KEREKESH
13CVF00336 MARIA HOLLAND 4/24/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs MARIA HOLLAND

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 432, 433, 434 ... 514, 515, 516  Next