20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVG03903 | JAIDEN HENDERSON | 10/11/2019 | |||||||
NOLAN REAL ESTATE AGT FOR GK OH APTS, LLC vs JAIDEN HENDERSON | |||||||||
19CVG03904 | TINASIA BARNEY | 10/11/2019 | |||||||
NOLAN REAL ESTATE AGENT FOR GK OH APTS, LLC vs TINASIA BARNEY | |||||||||
19CVG03902 | ANTONIO BYRD | 10/11/2019 | |||||||
NOLAN REAL ESTATE AGT FOR GK OH APTS, LLC vs ANTONIO BYRD | |||||||||
19CVG03891 | NICOLE JACKSON | 10/10/2019 | |||||||
GOOD STEWARD APARTMENTS, LLC vs NICOLE JACKSON | |||||||||
19CVI03889 | TK HOME IMPROVEMENT | 10/10/2019 | |||||||
DAVID R LEISER vs TK HOME IMPROVEMENT | |||||||||
19CVI03890 | ZIEBART OF CENTERVILLE | 10/10/2019 | |||||||
NOEL ANDERSON vs ZIEBART OF CENTERVILLE | |||||||||
19CVF03883 | BRENDAN SULLIVAN | 10/9/2019 | |||||||
MICHAEL A HOCHWALT vs BRENDAN SULLIVAN | |||||||||
19CVG03877 | ASHLEY SEWARD | 10/9/2019 | |||||||
BIRGE & HELD ASSET MGMT FOR NEW CHESAPEAKE, LLC vs ASHLEY SEWARD | |||||||||
19CVG03856 | PATSY LERMAN | 10/8/2019 | |||||||
DEP WYNDS APARTMENTS, LLC C/O BRG REALTY GROUP LLC vs PATSY LERMAN | |||||||||
19CVG03861 | TRACI KILIAN | 10/8/2019 | |||||||
TDI PROPERTIES LLC vs TRACI KILIAN | |||||||||
19CVG03860 | JEAN AIME NGARUKIYE | 10/8/2019 | |||||||
KETTERING RES LLC vs JEAN AIME NGARUKIYE | |||||||||
19CVG03855 | COURTNEY COTTRELL | 10/8/2019 | |||||||
KETTERING RES, LLC vs COURTNEY COTTRELL | |||||||||
19CVG03854 | ARIK MANLEY | 10/8/2019 | |||||||
KETTERING RES, LLC vs ARIK MANLEY | |||||||||
19CVF03862 | RACHEL MACKEY | 10/7/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs RACHEL MACKEY | |||||||||
19CVF03863 | MARY J FONTELES | 10/7/2019 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. vs MARY J FONTELES | |||||||||
19CVF03864 | CINDY EDGINGTON | 10/7/2019 | |||||||
DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, vs CINDY EDGINGTON | |||||||||
19CVF03865 | JOHN D KARNS II | 10/7/2019 | |||||||
DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, vs JOHN D KARNS II | |||||||||
19CVF03866 | DAWN WILLIAMS | 10/7/2019 | |||||||
DISTRESSED ASSET PORTFOLIO III, vs DAWN WILLIAMS | |||||||||
19CVF03867 | ROSEMARY PETERS | 10/7/2019 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs ROSEMARY PETERS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 430, 431, 432 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |