20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVF02995 | ROBERT J GIBSON | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs ROBERT J GIBSON | |||||||||
14CVF02996 | KELLY PARKER | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
CBCS vs KELLY PARKER | |||||||||
14CVF02997 | JASON E TOUHEY | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
CITIBANK NA SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SD), NA vs JASON E TOUHEY | |||||||||
14CVI02992 | ZACHARY ARMSTRONG | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
THE PACKAGING STORE vs ZACHARY ARMSTRONG | |||||||||
14CVF02994 | JOEY L BROWN | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIE vs JOEY L BROWN | |||||||||
14CVF02991 | ANGEL HEARTS PLUS HOME HEALTH | 12/12/2014 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO DEPARTMENT OF JOB vs ANGEL HEARTS PLUS HOME HEALTH | |||||||||
14CVV00299 | REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL | 12/12/2014 | |||||||
EVGENIA ZHUKOVA vs REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL | |||||||||
14CVI02990 | ANDREW MOORE | 12/11/2014 | |||||||
LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM O CASS JR vs ANDREW MOORE | |||||||||
14CVI02989 | MEGAN KNIGHT | 12/10/2014 | |||||||
ANDREW T JENKINS vs MEGAN KNIGHT | |||||||||
14CVV00298 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | 12/10/2014 | |||||||
GERALD BALLARD vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
14CVV00297 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | 12/10/2014 | |||||||
MATTHEW LOESCH vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
14CVG02987 | DAVID OWENS | 12/10/2014 | |||||||
ALPINE APARTMENTS vs DAVID OWENS | |||||||||
14CVF02988 | EUNICE HALL | 12/10/2014 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (S. DAKOTA vs EUNICE HALL | |||||||||
14CVG02985 | THOMAS E COMBS | 12/9/2014 | |||||||
THOMAS L REAGAN vs THOMAS E COMBS | |||||||||
14CVI02986 | ALLISON BARNES | 12/9/2014 | |||||||
JOHN A SHANER vs ALLISON BARNES | |||||||||
14CVV00292 | MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 12/9/2014 | |||||||
NANDER LE vs MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
14CVV00293 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | 12/9/2014 | |||||||
TAKAYUKI IGUCHI vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
14CVV00294 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | 12/9/2014 | |||||||
DEMARIS RAMSEY vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
14CVV00295 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | 12/9/2014 | |||||||
MELISSA POTTS vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 882, 883, 884 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |