20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVG03031 | TAMMY GAYHART | 12/24/2014 | |||||||
COLONY OF KETTERING, LLC vs TAMMY GAYHART | |||||||||
14CVG03027 | JAMES HARRISON | 12/24/2014 | |||||||
HUNTLEY RIDGE LLC vs JAMES HARRISON | |||||||||
14CVF03022 | AMBER MILEM | 12/23/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs AMBER MILEM | |||||||||
14CVF03023 | JILL KERNS | 12/23/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JILL KERNS | |||||||||
14CVF03024 | CARLA SHIVELY | 12/23/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs CARLA SHIVELY | |||||||||
14CVF03025 | JOSHUA G GLOWNEY | 12/23/2014 | |||||||
CBCS vs JOSHUA G GLOWNEY | |||||||||
14CVF03026 | JEFFREY C CURRY-KING | 12/23/2014 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP vs JEFFREY C CURRY-KING | |||||||||
14CVV00307 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 12/23/2014 | |||||||
ABRAHAM BELL vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
14CVF03020 | ASHLEY HOCKENBERRY | 12/22/2014 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs ASHLEY HOCKENBERRY | |||||||||
14CVV00306 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | 12/22/2014 | |||||||
COREY A ZELL vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | |||||||||
14CVF03021 | JENNIFER BOGGAN | 12/22/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JENNIFER BOGGAN | |||||||||
14CVF03019 | DUANPEN WEAVER | 12/22/2014 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs DUANPEN WEAVER | |||||||||
14CVF03018 | CHRISTOPHER REITH | 12/22/2014 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs CHRISTOPHER REITH | |||||||||
14CVF03015 | LISA ASBURY | 12/19/2014 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs LISA ASBURY | |||||||||
14CVF03016 | JEFFREY A TROUTT | 12/19/2014 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JEFFREY A TROUTT | |||||||||
14CVF03017 | JEFFREY A TROUTT | 12/19/2014 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JEFFREY A TROUTT | |||||||||
14CVV00304 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 12/19/2014 | |||||||
ROBERT J PASTIVA vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
14CVV00305 | MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 12/19/2014 | |||||||
JASON MOSLEY vs MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
14CVF03009 | DANIELLE SWANSTON | 12/18/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs DANIELLE SWANSTON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 880, 881, 882 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |