20817 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVI02033 | RCF PROPERTIES INC ANJANETTE FRYE | 1/15/2015 | |||||||
LAWN INNOVATIONS LLC vs RCF PROPERTIES INC ANJANETTE FRYE | |||||||||
15CVI02035 | CITY OF KETTERING | 1/15/2015 | |||||||
MARK THOMPSON vs CITY OF KETTERING | |||||||||
15CVF02036 | AVRAM R MEYEROWITZ | 1/15/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs AVRAM R MEYEROWITZ | |||||||||
15CVF02031 | MELINDA GIBSON | 1/14/2015 | |||||||
KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER vs MELINDA GIBSON | |||||||||
15CVF02032 | REBECCA K SMITH | 1/14/2015 | |||||||
KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER vs REBECCA K SMITH | |||||||||
15CVV00008 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 1/14/2015 | |||||||
DEREK TURTON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVI02028 | ERICA LYNN OVERSTREET | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
WILLIAM F SEMMETT vs ERICA LYNN OVERSTREET | |||||||||
15CVV00007 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
DESMOND BROWN vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVI02027 | CHRISTOPHER MOBLEY | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
WILLIAM SEMMETT vs CHRISTOPHER MOBLEY | |||||||||
15CVF02030 | RYAN WHARTON | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs RYAN WHARTON | |||||||||
15CVF02029 | JASON SMITH | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs JASON SMITH | |||||||||
15CVF02026 | BETTY HERRING | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs BETTY HERRING | |||||||||
15CVF02023 | THOMAS E STRICKLAND | 1/12/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs THOMAS E STRICKLAND | |||||||||
15CVF02024 | DON LAWRENCE | 1/12/2015 | |||||||
THOMAS R SCHIFF vs DON LAWRENCE | |||||||||
15CVF02025 | JACQUELINE GINN | 1/12/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs JACQUELINE GINN | |||||||||
15CVV00005 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES ATTN: HENRY GUZMAN | 1/12/2015 | |||||||
SHANON RANTA vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES ATTN: HENRY GUZMAN | |||||||||
15CVV00006 | DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 1/12/2015 | |||||||
CINDY J GNAU vs DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVF02020 | JACK R HARRISON | 1/9/2015 | |||||||
NEIMANN H SORRELL vs JACK R HARRISON | |||||||||
15CVF02021 | VERONICA RIVERA | 1/9/2015 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES LTD vs VERONICA RIVERA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 879, 880, 881 ... 1039, 1040, 1041 Next |