20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVF02412 | ANISSA HOWES | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs ANISSA HOWES | |||||||||
15CVF02413 | KELLY A FRY | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN KIDNEY STONE MANAGEMENT vs KELLY A FRY | |||||||||
15CVF02415 | ANTHONY LEE LANGER | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP vs ANTHONY LEE LANGER | |||||||||
15CVF02416 | GLORIA MARTOS | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
LARKSPIR APARTMENTS LLC vs GLORIA MARTOS | |||||||||
15CVF02417 | BENJAMIN D SWOOGER | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP vs BENJAMIN D SWOOGER | |||||||||
15CVF02418 | BRETT C REASONER | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP vs BRETT C REASONER | |||||||||
15CVG02414 | JOSH BURGER | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
DOVETREE APARTMENTS vs JOSH BURGER | |||||||||
15CVF02411 | DONNA ROBERSON | 5/26/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs DONNA ROBERSON | |||||||||
15CVG02409 | CONNIE INGRAM | 5/22/2015 | |||||||
VICKIE CARMAN vs CONNIE INGRAM | |||||||||
15CVG02408 | MICHAEL MATHEWS | 5/22/2015 | |||||||
R & D LUCAS RENTALS, LLC vs MICHAEL MATHEWS | |||||||||
15CVF02410 | KERON HUGGINS | 5/22/2015 | |||||||
THIRTY 43 BY THE GREENE vs KERON HUGGINS | |||||||||
15CVF02404 | RICHARD T GUERIN | 5/21/2015 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs RICHARD T GUERIN | |||||||||
15CVI02405 | EDDIE RODRIQUEZ | 5/21/2015 | |||||||
LOUIS V IMUNDO vs EDDIE RODRIQUEZ | |||||||||
15CVI02406 | ROBERT LINN | 5/21/2015 | |||||||
LOUIS V IMUNDO vs ROBERT LINN | |||||||||
15CVI02407 | SAMANTHA JO CRIDER | 5/21/2015 | |||||||
JOSEPH P HARMON vs SAMANTHA JO CRIDER | |||||||||
15CVF02402 | ERIC F WESTLEY | 5/20/2015 | |||||||
NCEP LLC vs ERIC F WESTLEY | |||||||||
15CVF02403 | ERICA N CAMPBELL | 5/20/2015 | |||||||
MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP C/O KIRSCHENBAUM, PHILLIPS & LEV vs ERICA N CAMPBELL | |||||||||
15CVF02394 | LONNIE D VAUGHN II | 5/19/2015 | |||||||
FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A. vs LONNIE D VAUGHN II | |||||||||
15CVF02395 | ASMA A CHOUDHURY | 5/19/2015 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC., INC vs ASMA A CHOUDHURY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 853, 854, 855 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |