20817 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVI02496 | MICHAEL BREITENSTEIN | 6/19/2015 | |||||||
JOSEPH TEMPLE vs MICHAEL BREITENSTEIN | |||||||||
15CVV00097 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 6/19/2015 | |||||||
PHILIP THOMERSON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVV00098 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 6/19/2015 | |||||||
KATHLEEN CONLEY vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVF02497 | DIANA SANTOIANNI | 6/19/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs DIANA SANTOIANNI | |||||||||
15CVF02491 | BENJAMIN OSTERFELD | 6/18/2015 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs BENJAMIN OSTERFELD | |||||||||
15CVF02492 | FREDRICK R WILSON | 6/18/2015 | |||||||
CORE CREDIT UNION, INC. an Ohio non-profit corporation vs FREDRICK R WILSON | |||||||||
15CVF02493 | KATHLEEN SHAY | 6/18/2015 | |||||||
REGENCY FINANCE COMPANY FDBA CITIZENS FINANCIAL SERVICES vs KATHLEEN SHAY | |||||||||
15CVG02494 | TEKOYAE BYRD | 6/18/2015 | |||||||
TRAILS OF OAK CREEK vs TEKOYAE BYRD | |||||||||
15CVG02490 | LADONNA M BOYD | 6/17/2015 | |||||||
CHEVY CHASE PARK APARTMENTS vs LADONNA M BOYD | |||||||||
15CVI02488 | MR HEIDER | 6/17/2015 | |||||||
ELENA GAVRILOVA vs MR HEIDER | |||||||||
15CVG02489 | TOM LEE | 6/17/2015 | |||||||
MIGUEL VENTURA vs TOM LEE | |||||||||
15CVF02487 | TONI M JONES | 6/17/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs TONI M JONES | |||||||||
15CVF02484 | NICHOLAS E HOAJA | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
DAYTON FIREFIGHTERS FEDERAL CRED vs NICHOLAS E HOAJA | |||||||||
15CVF02485 | ROBERT FIELD | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
JAFFE JEWELRY vs ROBERT FIELD | |||||||||
15CVF02486 | TRACY BALL | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
NTL COLLEGIATEMASTER STD vs TRACY BALL | |||||||||
15CVI02482 | PAULA KERN (PRICE) | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
SUE WHITNEY vs PAULA KERN (PRICE) | |||||||||
15CVI02483 | MICHAEL KONICKI | 6/16/2015 | |||||||
THOMAS R SCHIFF vs MICHAEL KONICKI | |||||||||
15CVF02477 | DAVID BLACKLOCK | 6/12/2015 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs DAVID BLACKLOCK | |||||||||
15CVF02478 | ANA TAYLOR | 6/12/2015 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs ANA TAYLOR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 850, 851, 852 ... 1039, 1040, 1041 Next |