20614 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVF02978 | AMANDA TESARZ | 10/31/2016 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs AMANDA TESARZ | |||||||||
16CVF02979 | BETH MOKAS | 10/31/2016 | |||||||
PRIMROSE SCHOOL OF CENTERVILLE vs BETH MOKAS | |||||||||
16CVF02981 | CARLA PARKER | 10/31/2016 | |||||||
EARLY BEGINNINGS vs CARLA PARKER | |||||||||
16CVG02980 | STACEY PICKTHORN | 10/31/2016 | |||||||
COCAP LLC vs STACEY PICKTHORN | |||||||||
16CVV00158 | BMV | 10/31/2016 | |||||||
TRACY HENDERSON vs BMV | |||||||||
16CVF02977 | SCOTT DAILEY | 10/31/2016 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs SCOTT DAILEY | |||||||||
16CVF02970 | LAWRENCE STAUB | 10/27/2016 | |||||||
RBC, INC vs LAWRENCE STAUB | |||||||||
16CVF02971 | HEIL BROS. LAWN & GARDEN EQUIPMENT - HEIL BROS... | 10/27/2016 | |||||||
CRAIG TOBIN vs HEIL BROS. LAWN & GARDEN EQUIPMENT - HEIL BROS... | |||||||||
16CVV00157 | REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL | 10/27/2016 | |||||||
SVITLANA V JENSVOLD vs REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL | |||||||||
16CVF02967 | GARY LEASURE | 10/26/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs GARY LEASURE | |||||||||
16CVI02969 | ANDY WERTZ | 10/26/2016 | |||||||
AMARA JOHNSON vs ANDY WERTZ | |||||||||
16CVF02968 | LISA A BOWMAN | 10/26/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs LISA A BOWMAN | |||||||||
16CVF02966 | NATALIE N KAUFFMAN | 10/26/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs NATALIE N KAUFFMAN | |||||||||
16CVF02964 | AMBER WYRICK | 10/25/2016 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION, INC vs AMBER WYRICK | |||||||||
16CVF02965 | CHOXI.COM, INC | 10/25/2016 | |||||||
BAILEY & JENSEN, INC vs CHOXI.COM, INC | |||||||||
16CVI02963 | SEAN VALLONE | 10/25/2016 | |||||||
DONALD WEIHRAUCH vs SEAN VALLONE | |||||||||
16CVF02951 | CONNIE M APOSTELOS | 10/24/2016 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs CONNIE M APOSTELOS | |||||||||
16CVF02953 | OTIS L LEWIS JR. | 10/24/2016 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs OTIS L LEWIS Jr. | |||||||||
16CVF02954 | BETTE K IRELAN | 10/24/2016 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs BETTE K IRELAN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 736, 737, 738 ... 1029, 1030, 1031 Next |