20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVV00018 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
CARL GREEN III vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
17CVV00019 | DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
DANIEL J BROWN vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
17CVV00017 | REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
ANUI D DESAI vs REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL | |||||||||
17CVF02245 | LACEY STRINGFIELD | 2/17/2017 | |||||||
SHERWIN WILLIAMS CO vs LACEY STRINGFIELD | |||||||||
17CVG02241 | TAHLAYA GONZALEZ | 2/17/2017 | |||||||
GEORGETOWN OF KETTERING APARTMENTS vs TAHLAYA GONZALEZ | |||||||||
17CVG02242 | ZAYAD ALSUBAIE | 2/17/2017 | |||||||
GEORGETOWN OF KETTERING APARTMENTS vs ZAYAD ALSUBAIE | |||||||||
17CVG02243 | CONSTANCE ALLEN-STEVENS | 2/17/2017 | |||||||
GEORGETOWN OF KETTERING APARTMENTS vs CONSTANCE ALLEN-STEVENS | |||||||||
17CVG02244 | TONYA MUNDAY | 2/17/2017 | |||||||
ITALIAN GREEK INVESTMENTS, LLC vs TONYA MUNDAY | |||||||||
17CVI02246 | AARON ZOLLARS | 2/17/2017 | |||||||
JOHN E TEVERBAUGH vs AARON ZOLLARS | |||||||||
17CVF02235 | DEE D CLAYBROOK | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. vs DEE D CLAYBROOK | |||||||||
17CVV00016 | DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
KASSIE GILBERT vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
17CVG02238 | COREY ROUNDFIELD | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
HUNTLEY RIDGE LLC vs COREY ROUNDFIELD | |||||||||
17CVG02237 | ALONNA NORTHROP | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
WELLER MORTGAGES INC vs ALONNA NORTHROP | |||||||||
17CVF02240 | TRI-STAR SCIENTIFIC INC | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
SARTORIUS STEDIM NORTH AMERICA vs TRI-STAR SCIENTIFIC INC | |||||||||
17CVF02239 | JOSEPH W ASHLEY | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC., IN vs JOSEPH W ASHLEY | |||||||||
17CVF02236 | AUSTIN L SMITH | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
RAHN DENTAL GROUP INC vs AUSTIN L SMITH | |||||||||
17CVF02234 | LYNSI LANG | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs LYNSI LANG | |||||||||
17CVV00015 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 2/15/2017 | |||||||
WALTER V CHERWINSKI vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
17CVF02226 | KRISTOPHER M JACOBS | 2/14/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs KRISTOPHER M JACOBS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 711, 712, 713 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |