20614 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVI03089 | DEBORAH STALEY | 7/9/2018 | |||||||
PETER HAYNAL vs DEBORAH STALEY | |||||||||
18CVG03091 | WESLEY BROADBENT | 7/9/2018 | |||||||
NEW CHESAPEAKE LLC vs WESLEY BROADBENT | |||||||||
18CVG03084 | CHRIS BUSCH | 7/6/2018 | |||||||
ANJO RENTAL HOLDINGS, LLC vs CHRIS BUSCH | |||||||||
18CVF03082 | PERCY FRASIER | 7/5/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs PERCY FRASIER | |||||||||
18CVF03083 | PAUL A MASTERS | 7/5/2018 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC c/o LEVY AND ASSOC, LLC vs PAUL A MASTERS | |||||||||
18CVF03085 | JOYCE FELTNER | 7/5/2018 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs JOYCE FELTNER | |||||||||
18CVF03086 | NATASHA N FALL | 7/5/2018 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC c/o LEVY AND ASSOC, LLC vs NATASHA N FALL | |||||||||
18CVG03081 | STACY CALVIN | 7/5/2018 | |||||||
AE3 PROPERTIES vs STACY CALVIN | |||||||||
18CVG03079 | SHEENA JOHNSON | 7/3/2018 | |||||||
DOVETREE APARTMENTS vs SHEENA JOHNSON | |||||||||
18CVV00066 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 7/3/2018 | |||||||
BRANDIE E WENDELL vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
18CVF03075 | LINDSEY E PAYNE | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, P.C. vs LINDSEY E PAYNE | |||||||||
18CVG03080 | ALLEN PATRICK | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs ALLEN PATRICK | |||||||||
18CVF03078 | PAUL COMBS | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs PAUL COMBS | |||||||||
18CVF03077 | TIMOTHY HABERSTRO | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs TIMOTHY HABERSTRO | |||||||||
18CVF03076 | ROBERT COLLINS | 7/2/2018 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs ROBERT COLLINS | |||||||||
18CVF03062 | JONATHAN OLINGER | 6/29/2018 | |||||||
ROGERS & GREENBERG L.L.P. vs JONATHAN OLINGER | |||||||||
18CVF03063 | BROOK IRWIN | 6/29/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BROOK IRWIN | |||||||||
18CVF03064 | LINDSEY S DOTY | 6/29/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO INC vs LINDSEY S DOTY | |||||||||
18CVF03065 | JACK FAIN | 6/29/2018 | |||||||
RAZOR CAPITAL LLC vs JACK FAIN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 558, 559, 560 ... 1029, 1030, 1031 Next |