20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF03446 | JEREMY HARVEY | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs JEREMY HARVEY | |||||||||
18CVI03438 | DAVIDS EARLY BIRD LAWN CARE | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
KIMBERLY THOMPSON vs DAVIDS EARLY BIRD LAWN CARE | |||||||||
18CVG03444 | DAKOTA BINGHAM | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
OZNER PROPERTIES LLC vs DAKOTA BINGHAM | |||||||||
18CVG03437 | DONNA MILLER | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
AMERICAN MANAGEMENT PROPERTY SOLUTIONS vs DONNA MILLER | |||||||||
18CVG03436 | LISA BROWN | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
MIMG LXXXIX VAN BUREN VILLAGE vs LISA BROWN | |||||||||
18CVG03435 | JUSTIN VAN CLEVE | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
MIMG LXXXIX VAN BUREN VILLAGE vs JUSTIN VAN CLEVE | |||||||||
18CVG03434 | JOHNNA NORTH | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
MIMG LXXXIX VAN BUREN VILLAGE vs JOHNNA NORTH | |||||||||
18CVF03449 | PHILLIP W PARMLEY | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
SSENEX SERVICES CORP. vs PHILLIP W PARMLEY | |||||||||
18CVF03448 | ADAM J LONG | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs ADAM J LONG | |||||||||
18CVF03447 | TYLER ADAMS | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC vs TYLER ADAMS | |||||||||
18CVF03445 | SANDRA BUTTERY | 9/12/2018 | |||||||
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs SANDRA BUTTERY | |||||||||
18CVG03432 | MELISSA CONSTABLE | 9/11/2018 | |||||||
JANJA SAPINA vs MELISSA CONSTABLE | |||||||||
18CVF03431 | NEAL SISK | 9/10/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs NEAL SISK | |||||||||
18CVG03430 | JOY OWENS | 9/10/2018 | |||||||
DANIEL C OWENS vs JOY OWENS | |||||||||
18CVV00082 | DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 9/10/2018 | |||||||
YVONNEDA STILL vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
18CVF03428 | PENNY MEYER | 9/7/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs PENNY MEYER | |||||||||
18CVF03429 | MICHELLE WHITELY | 9/7/2018 | |||||||
ANDREW M ENGEL vs MICHELLE WHITELY | |||||||||
18CVF03418 | PAMELA SCOTT | 9/6/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, P.C. vs PAMELA SCOTT | |||||||||
18CVF03422 | KARRI M COX | 9/6/2018 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs KARRI M COX | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 547, 548, 549 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |