Daily Law Journal
11197 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
12CVG02893 PATRICIA ARNOLD 7/31/2012
REVERE VILLAGE APARTMENTS vs PATRICIA ARNOLD
12CVG02894 GARY SHORT 7/31/2012
REVERE VILLAGE APARTMENTS vs GARY SHORT
12CVV00137 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO 7/31/2012
LEE SPAULDING vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO
12CVV00138 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 7/31/2012
THOMAS J SMART vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...
12CVF02886 MICHAEL R STAHL 7/31/2012
SANDY'S TOWING C/O RICHARD D. SCHILLING ESQ vs MICHAEL R STAHL
12CVF02882 TERESA L WARNER 7/30/2012
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC., IN vs TERESA L WARNER
12CVF02883 LIL A BLANTON-SCHULZE 7/30/2012
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC., INC vs LIL A BLANTON-SCHULZE
12CVF02881 NICOLE A HARDIN 7/30/2012
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs NICOLE A HARDIN
12CVF02877 PATRICIA M SCHAEFFER 7/27/2012
OHIO NEIGHBORHOOD FINANCE INC vs PATRICIA M SCHAEFFER
12CVF02878 FLEMMING HANSEN 7/27/2012
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs FLEMMING HANSEN
12CVF02880 MARK KLUG 7/27/2012
CREDIT INVESTMENTS, INC vs MARK KLUG
12CVI02879 JILL CRAFTON 7/27/2012
OUTSTANDING HEATING & AIR, LLC vs JILL CRAFTON
12CVI02875 MARK EWART 7/26/2012
CNG COMPUTERS/ CURTIS EDWARDS vs MARK EWART
12CVV00135 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES 7/26/2012
ANTHONY M ROSS vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES
12CVV00136 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES 7/26/2012
KERRY B YOUNG vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES
12CVF02876 PLATINUM EXPRESS, INC 7/26/2012
TOTAL QUALITY LOGISTICS, LLC vs PLATINUM EXPRESS, INC
12CVF02871 JOHN BROWN 7/25/2012
ANDREW NODZAK vs JOHN BROWN
12CVF02872 SWOOSH PLUMBING SERVICES, LLC 7/25/2012
UTILITY SERVICE AND SUPPLY, INC vs SWOOSH PLUMBING SERVICES, LLC

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 542, 543, 544 ... 558, 559, 560  Next