Daily Law Journal
12154 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
13CVV00051 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 4/3/2013
CRAIG A FLOHRE vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...
13CVV00052 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 4/3/2013
AMANDA TERRY vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...
13CVF00280 MARY L RIDSBY 4/2/2013
LIBERTY RETIREMENT COMMUNITY OF WASHINGTON TWNSHP, INC vs MARY L RIDSBY
13CVF00281 STEFAN WINTER 4/2/2013
GOLLINGS ARENA DODGE vs STEFAN WINTER
13CVF00279 MICHELE BLACK 4/1/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs MICHELE BLACK
13CVF00272 MICHELLE BOTTS 4/1/2013
CBCS vs MICHELLE BOTTS
13CVG00270 MICHELLE BRUMFIELD 4/1/2013
CHEVY CHASE PARK APARTMENTS vs MICHELLE BRUMFIELD
13CVF00273 ANITA ALLEN 4/1/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs ANITA ALLEN
13CVI00271 PATRICK JONES 4/1/2013
YANKEE CAR WASH & DETAILING vs PATRICK JONES
13CVF00275 DALE SAYLOR 4/1/2013
AUTOVEST, LLC vs DALE SAYLOR
13CVI00274 ESMERALDA KELLEY 4/1/2013
THOMAS HOLTZ vs ESMERALDA KELLEY
13CVF00276 BARRY S MCCONKEY 4/1/2013
CITIBANK (SO DAKOTA) NA SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SO DAKOTA vs BARRY S MCCONKEY
13CVV00048 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 4/1/2013
CHRISTOPHER WERLING vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...
13CVF00277 TERRANCE HEDRICK 4/1/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs TERRANCE HEDRICK
13CVV00049 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 4/1/2013
TYLER KUSHNER vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...
13CVF00278 JILL KLIMASKI 4/1/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs JILL KLIMASKI
13CVV00050 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 4/1/2013
LISA ENGLAND vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...
13CVF00269 CHARLES J FLANERY 3/29/2013
DON WRIGHT REALTY LLC vs CHARLES J FLANERY
13CVF00267 CARA CORNELL 3/28/2013
MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs CARA CORNELL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 535, 536, 537 ... 606, 607, 608  Next