20713 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVV00006 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 1/15/2019 | |||||||
ADAM CROSS vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
19CVE02106 | ROXANNA A DIAZ | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs ROXANNA A DIAZ | |||||||||
19CVF02099 | JAMES TORELLO | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-GOVERNOURS SQUARE, L vs JAMES TORELLO | |||||||||
19CVF02100 | REBEKAH DAVIS | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs REBEKAH DAVIS | |||||||||
19CVF02101 | PERCY FRASIER | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs PERCY FRASIER | |||||||||
19CVF02102 | KATHLEEN K MULHERN | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs KATHLEEN K MULHERN | |||||||||
19CVF02103 | JASON N KERN | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs JASON N KERN | |||||||||
19CVF02104 | JILL FLAUTE | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JILL FLAUTE | |||||||||
19CVF02105 | SPENCER DUGAN | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SPENCER DUGAN | |||||||||
19CVG02088 | RECECCA PAYNE | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
TODD BRANDEWIE vs RECECCA PAYNE | |||||||||
19CVG02080 | JESSICA HANKE | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
ANTHONY DENNY vs JESSICA HANKE | |||||||||
19CVG02087 | KYLE P GILLIAM-BEALE | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
ONE4U INVESTMENTS LLC vs KYLE P GILLIAM-BEALE | |||||||||
19CVG02081 | LISA THOMAS | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
STEPHANIE BRESLIN DE SOSA vs LISA THOMAS | |||||||||
19CVF02041 | ADELL YARBROUGH | 1/10/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs ADELL YARBROUGH | |||||||||
19CVF02084 | CHRISTOPHER PAGE | 1/10/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs CHRISTOPHER PAGE | |||||||||
19CVF02067 | ABBEY HYDE | 1/9/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ABBEY HYDE | |||||||||
19CVF02068 | KEVIN S WAGNER | 1/9/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs KEVIN S WAGNER | |||||||||
19CVF02069 | TRICIA DILLAVOU | 1/9/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TRICIA DILLAVOU | |||||||||
19CVF02070 | THOMAS CLINGNER | 1/9/2019 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC vs THOMAS CLINGNER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 515, 516, 517 ... 1034, 1035, 1036 Next |