20713 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF02292 | MATTHEW DEATON | 2/11/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs MATTHEW DEATON | |||||||||
19CVG02248 | BRITTANY PACK | 2/11/2019 | |||||||
SELLARS PLACE LLC vs BRITTANY PACK | |||||||||
19CVG02250 | TERESA BOLLMER | 2/11/2019 | |||||||
JONATHAN H MURRAY vs TERESA BOLLMER | |||||||||
19CVG02251 | DAVID EDWIN COX | 2/11/2019 | |||||||
LAWRENCE IMUNDO vs DAVID EDWIN COX | |||||||||
19CVG02252 | LYNN DUDLEY | 2/11/2019 | |||||||
GEM CITY MHP LLC vs LYNN DUDLEY | |||||||||
19CVG02253 | JULIA YOUNGERMAN | 2/11/2019 | |||||||
NADER GIRGIS vs JULIA YOUNGERMAN | |||||||||
19CVI02265 | DONALD E WASHINGTON | 2/11/2019 | |||||||
KOHLER FOODS INC vs DONALD E WASHINGTON | |||||||||
19CVI02266 | MONICA RYDER | 2/11/2019 | |||||||
DAVING REYNOLDS vs MONICA RYDER | |||||||||
19CVF02291 | SARAH GEORGESCU | 2/11/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs SARAH GEORGESCU | |||||||||
19CVV00012 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES CHARLES L. NORMAN, REGIST... | 2/8/2019 | |||||||
JAMES B RAUCH vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES CHARLES L. NORMAN, REGIST... | |||||||||
19CVF02247 | CHRISTOPHER LEE | 2/8/2019 | |||||||
FOX HUNT OWNER LLC vs CHRISTOPHER LEE | |||||||||
19CVF02245 | NICOLE WALSER | 2/7/2019 | |||||||
SYNCHROY BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PC vs NICOLE WALSER | |||||||||
19CVF02239 | DANA M DAVIS | 2/6/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs DANA M DAVIS | |||||||||
19CVF02240 | TAYLOR MOORE | 2/6/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs TAYLOR MOORE | |||||||||
19CVF02241 | SHEILA YOCUM | 2/6/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SHEILA YOCUM | |||||||||
19CVF02242 | DANIEL SULLIVAN | 2/6/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs DANIEL SULLIVAN | |||||||||
19CVF02243 | CHRISTINE PENICK | 2/6/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CHRISTINE PENICK | |||||||||
19CVF02244 | CHRISTINE HENNING | 2/6/2019 | |||||||
R & R RECOVERY ZONE, INC vs CHRISTINE HENNING | |||||||||
19CVF02226 | TINA ARONHALT | 2/5/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs TINA ARONHALT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 508, 509, 510 ... 1034, 1035, 1036 Next |