10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF02535 | DANIEL L LANE | 8/21/2017 | |||||||
VALLONE LAW OFFICES, LPA vs DANIEL L LANE | |||||||||
17CVF02820 | CHARLES MILLER | 8/21/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CHARLES MILLER | |||||||||
17CVF02824 | AMBER VITORI | 8/21/2017 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs AMBER VITORI | |||||||||
17CVF02927 | LARRY A BANKS | 8/21/2017 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs LARRY A BANKS | |||||||||
17CVF02427 | CRYSTAL L MASTERS | 8/21/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CRYSTAL L MASTERS | |||||||||
17CVF02742 | JENNIFER FARIS | 8/18/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JENNIFER FARIS | |||||||||
17CVF02774 | AMY J KERNS | 8/18/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs AMY J KERNS | |||||||||
17CVF02772 | SAJA WAHDAN | 8/18/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SAJA WAHDAN | |||||||||
17CVF02701 | MICHAEL STUTZ | 8/18/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES vs MICHAEL STUTZ | |||||||||
17CVF02540 | SONDRA E BROWN | 8/18/2017 | |||||||
HEARTLAND FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs SONDRA E BROWN | |||||||||
17CVF02007 | SUSAN SAMPSON | 8/18/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SUSAN SAMPSON | |||||||||
16CVF02887 | SHANNON S SCOTT | 8/18/2017 | |||||||
JVM REALTY CORP vs SHANNON S SCOTT | |||||||||
15CVF03008 | JAROD TIPTON | 8/18/2017 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs JAROD TIPTON | |||||||||
17CVI02739 | LANCE JORGENSEN | 8/17/2017 | |||||||
DEAN O'NEAL vs LANCE JORGENSEN | |||||||||
17CVF02788 | DEBORAH A MADISON | 8/16/2017 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO INC vs DEBORAH A MADISON | |||||||||
17CVE02598 | LAMONT BRIAN WATSON | 8/15/2017 | |||||||
DEONTA M BROWN vs LAMONT BRIAN WATSON | |||||||||
17CVF02510 | DAVID A ABRAHAM | 8/15/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs DAVID A ABRAHAM | |||||||||
17CVG02996 | ALLIANCE MANUFACTURING CONCEPTS, LLC | 8/15/2017 | |||||||
RENTZ PROPERTIES, LLC vs ALLIANCE MANUFACTURING CONCEPTS, LLC | |||||||||
15CVF02712 | JEFF SUTHERLAND | 8/14/2017 | |||||||
R K ASSOCIATES LLC vs JEFF SUTHERLAND | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 356, 357, 358 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |