10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF02821 | SUSAN L WALTERS | 10/20/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs SUSAN L WALTERS | |||||||||
17CVF02804 | KEVIN DEMPSEY | 10/20/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES vs KEVIN DEMPSEY | |||||||||
17CVF02782 | JASSON M HENDERSON | 10/19/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JASSON M HENDERSON | |||||||||
17CVF02884 | EMILY M LANE | 10/19/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs EMILY M LANE | |||||||||
17CVF03196 | JACOB C HUSSEY | 10/19/2017 | |||||||
CBCS vs JACOB C HUSSEY | |||||||||
17CVF03220 | JAMES R EMMONS | 10/19/2017 | |||||||
CBCS vs JAMES R EMMONS | |||||||||
17CVI02883 | GAIL L FULCOMER | 10/19/2017 | |||||||
EUGENE SUNDAY vs GAIL L FULCOMER | |||||||||
17CVI03248 | GLORIA T SMITH | 10/19/2017 | |||||||
STEPHEN WEEBER, DPM vs GLORIA T SMITH | |||||||||
17CVF03293 | SARAH FROST | 10/17/2017 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND LP vs SARAH FROST | |||||||||
17CVF03310 | GRETCHEN D KLABER | 10/17/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs GRETCHEN D KLABER | |||||||||
17CVF02919 | ADELL YARBROUGH | 10/16/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs ADELL YARBROUGH | |||||||||
17CVF03300 | REGINALD DANIELS | 10/13/2017 | |||||||
CBCS vs REGINALD DANIELS | |||||||||
16CVF02761 | THERASA COLTER | 10/12/2017 | |||||||
FRANKLIN UNIVERSITY vs THERASA COLTER | |||||||||
17CVF02615 | STEPHEN RALEY | 10/12/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs STEPHEN RALEY | |||||||||
17CVF02748 | ANGELA T ECHCAROFF | 10/12/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ANGELA T ECHCAROFF | |||||||||
17CVF02837 | DONNA FELKLEY | 10/12/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs DONNA FELKLEY | |||||||||
17CVF02944 | DANIELLE STCLAIR | 10/12/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DANIELLE STCLAIR | |||||||||
17CVF02959 | RHONDA BREEZE | 10/12/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs RHONDA BREEZE | |||||||||
17CVF03392 | CYNTHIA L HAYES | 10/12/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs CYNTHIA L HAYES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 348, 349, 350 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |