10106 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF03111 | JERRET STONE | 11/1/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JERRET STONE | |||||||||
17CVF03182 | SABDRA L DUNFEE | 11/1/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs SABDRA L DUNFEE | |||||||||
16CVI03085 | BRITTANY A DONOVAN | 11/1/2017 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY, LLC vs BRITTANY A DONOVAN | |||||||||
17CVF03105 | DANA HAIRSTON | 11/1/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DANA HAIRSTON | |||||||||
17CVF02839 | NANCY DAILY | 10/31/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs NANCY DAILY | |||||||||
17CVF02912 | CHAD R NICHOLS | 10/31/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CHAD R NICHOLS | |||||||||
17CVF03358 | RANDALL LAKE | 10/31/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs RANDALL LAKE | |||||||||
17CVF02761 | KEVIN SHURTS | 10/26/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs KEVIN SHURTS | |||||||||
17CVF03209 | WILLIAM BURNS | 10/26/2017 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs WILLIAM BURNS | |||||||||
17CVF02685 | JOHN WARD | 10/26/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JOHN WARD | |||||||||
17CVF02648 | CARLOS CHAVANDO | 10/26/2017 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs CARLOS CHAVANDO | |||||||||
17CVF02475 | TAIYYIBA MIRZA | 10/26/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs TAIYYIBA MIRZA | |||||||||
16CVF02699 | MICHAEL J RAWERS | 10/25/2017 | |||||||
AUTOVEST, L.L.C. vs MICHAEL J RAWERS | |||||||||
17CVF03002 | DAVID A DEWBERRY | 10/25/2017 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs DAVID A DEWBERRY | |||||||||
17CVF03080 | NANCY SAUNDERS | 10/25/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs NANCY SAUNDERS | |||||||||
16CVE03165 | RONALD ODALE APPLEBERRY JR. | 10/24/2017 | |||||||
GRANGE MUTUAL CASUALTY CO vs RONALD ODALE APPLEBERRY Jr. | |||||||||
17CVE02991 | BRYAN WALKER | 10/24/2017 | |||||||
VECTREN ENERGY DELIVERY OF OHIO, vs BRYAN WALKER | |||||||||
17CVF03078 | SHAYNA REED | 10/24/2017 | |||||||
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC vs SHAYNA REED | |||||||||
17CVF03085 | GARY OSBORN | 10/24/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs GARY OSBORN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 346, 347, 348 ... 504, 505, 506 Next |