10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF02663 | WILLIAM R LAVIN | 11/21/2017 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs WILLIAM R LAVIN | |||||||||
17CVF03412 | LACHRISHA WHITEHOUSE | 11/21/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs LACHRISHA WHITEHOUSE | |||||||||
17CVG03284 | COURTNEY ANSLEY | 11/21/2017 | |||||||
BARBARA VANKIRK vs COURTNEY ANSLEY | |||||||||
17CVI03416 | VALERIE MITCHELL | 11/21/2017 | |||||||
DAHM BROTHERS CO. INC vs VALERIE MITCHELL | |||||||||
17CVI03437 | ROBERT KEITH PHILLIPS | 11/21/2017 | |||||||
STEPHEN A WEEBER, D P M vs ROBERT KEITH PHILLIPS | |||||||||
17CVF02641 | JASON L LEWIS | 11/21/2017 | |||||||
VALLONE LAW OFFICES, LPA vs JASON L LEWIS | |||||||||
17CVF03391 | PAUL HOUSTON | 11/20/2017 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs PAUL HOUSTON | |||||||||
17CVF03261 | WILLIAM PARRIES | 11/20/2017 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK vs WILLIAM PARRIES | |||||||||
17CVF03007 | AMY L FOSTON | 11/20/2017 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs AMY L FOSTON | |||||||||
17CVF02925 | TYONNA RODDY | 11/20/2017 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs TYONNA RODDY | |||||||||
17CVF02793 | LINDSAY MAGNER | 11/20/2017 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs LINDSAY MAGNER | |||||||||
17CVF02363 | NORMA MOORE | 11/17/2017 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs NORMA MOORE | |||||||||
17CVF02939 | HEATHER L DALTON | 11/16/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs HEATHER L DALTON | |||||||||
17CVE02743 | NATHAN L RICHMOND | 11/14/2017 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INS CO vs NATHAN L RICHMOND | |||||||||
17CVF02518 | MELISSA KELLER | 11/14/2017 | |||||||
ROGERS & GREENBERG L.L.P. vs MELISSA KELLER | |||||||||
17CVF02988 | MICHAEL R SOUTHARD | 11/14/2017 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC. INC vs MICHAEL R SOUTHARD | |||||||||
17CVF03121 | EARL TRAWICK | 11/14/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs EARL TRAWICK | |||||||||
17CVF03122 | ZACHARY LAMB | 11/14/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ZACHARY LAMB | |||||||||
17CVF03174 | GEORGE BOMBERRY JR. | 11/14/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs GEORGE BOMBERRY Jr. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 344, 345, 346 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |