10106 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF03606 | KAREN K HAMBY | 12/29/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs KAREN K HAMBY | |||||||||
17CVF03001 | DAVA L DURHAM | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs DAVA L DURHAM | |||||||||
17CVF03298 | THOMAS MANLEY IV | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs THOMAS MANLEY IV | |||||||||
17CVF03313 | DORI MOSS | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC BUYER vs DORI MOSS | |||||||||
17CVF03351 | LAURA NERI | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs LAURA NERI | |||||||||
17CVF03449 | WILLIAM R HOGAN | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUS P.C vs WILLIAM R HOGAN | |||||||||
17CVV00126 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 12/28/2017 | |||||||
ROBERT BLAKELY vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
17CVE02603 | TIFFANY DANIELLE CHILTON | 12/27/2017 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE CO. vs TIFFANY DANIELLE CHILTON | |||||||||
17CVF02872 | BRUCE HANES | 12/27/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs BRUCE HANES | |||||||||
17CVF03199 | VICTOR PEAGLER | 12/22/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs VICTOR PEAGLER | |||||||||
17CVF03532 | RACHEL FARACI | 12/22/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs RACHEL FARACI | |||||||||
17CVF03177 | OMAR SAID | 12/22/2017 | |||||||
CHIMNEY'S OF OAK CREEK APARTMENT vs OMAR SAID | |||||||||
17CVF03726 | KEITH FULTZ | 12/21/2017 | |||||||
CBCS vs KEITH FULTZ | |||||||||
17CVI03247 | TERESA MANCUSO | 12/21/2017 | |||||||
STEPHEN A WEEBER, D P M vs TERESA MANCUSO | |||||||||
17CVI03362 | JOSEPH DULANEY | 12/21/2017 | |||||||
GETTY LAW OFFICE, L.L.C. vs JOSEPH DULANEY | |||||||||
17CVI03616 | KEITH WOODS | 12/21/2017 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE REALTOR vs KEITH WOODS | |||||||||
17CVF02633 | THOMAS FRENCH | 12/20/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs THOMAS FRENCH | |||||||||
17CVF02645 | VINCENT VIRTULLO | 12/20/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs VINCENT VIRTULLO | |||||||||
16CVE02606 | BRITTANY CROSSLEY | 12/19/2017 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs BRITTANY CROSSLEY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 337, 338, 339 ... 504, 505, 506 Next |