10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF03589 | TERRY ELIFRITZ | 1/12/2018 | |||||||
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC vs TERRY ELIFRITZ | |||||||||
17CVF02802 | TODD EDMONDSON | 1/11/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs TODD EDMONDSON | |||||||||
17CVF02956 | SIERRA SANNER | 1/11/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs SIERRA SANNER | |||||||||
17CVF02958 | MICHAEL WEBB | 1/11/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MICHAEL WEBB | |||||||||
17CVF03108 | JOHN WEBER | 1/11/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JOHN WEBER | |||||||||
17CVF03109 | JENNIFER MORRISON | 1/11/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JENNIFER MORRISON | |||||||||
17CVF03397 | LINDSAY CARPENTER | 1/11/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs LINDSAY CARPENTER | |||||||||
17CVF03443 | MELISSA PHILLIPS | 1/11/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MELISSA PHILLIPS | |||||||||
17CVF03577 | LATANIA VILLALPANDO | 1/11/2018 | |||||||
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO. LPA vs LATANIA VILLALPANDO | |||||||||
17CVF03303 | TANYA S GREEN | 1/10/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs TANYA S GREEN | |||||||||
17CVI03818 | ADOLPHUS B WOOD JR. | 1/10/2018 | |||||||
LINCOLN PARK MANOR vs ADOLPHUS B WOOD Jr. | |||||||||
17CVF03692 | AMANDA N LOWERY | 1/10/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, P.C. vs AMANDA N LOWERY | |||||||||
17CVF03410 | BRIAN HUCKE | 1/10/2018 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS vs BRIAN HUCKE | |||||||||
17CVF03016 | GARY SWEATT | 1/10/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs GARY SWEATT | |||||||||
17CVF03132 | KYLE BRITCH | 1/9/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP c/o LEVY & ASSOC, LLC vs KYLE BRITCH | |||||||||
17CVF02066 | BIANCA N BRYAN | 1/8/2018 | |||||||
TD BANK USA N.A. TARGET NATIONAL BANK vs BIANCA N BRYAN | |||||||||
17CVF02652 | CHRISTA SAPP | 1/8/2018 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIE LTD vs CHRISTA SAPP | |||||||||
17CVF03308 | DAVID E HOCKER | 1/8/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs DAVID E HOCKER | |||||||||
17CVF03462 | KIMBERLY SIEVERS | 1/8/2018 | |||||||
TRAVES TAYLOR vs KIMBERLY SIEVERS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 336, 337, 338 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |