10058 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF02872 | BRUCE HANES | 12/27/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs BRUCE HANES | |||||||||
17CVF03177 | OMAR SAID | 12/22/2017 | |||||||
CHIMNEY'S OF OAK CREEK APARTMENT vs OMAR SAID | |||||||||
17CVF03199 | VICTOR PEAGLER | 12/22/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs VICTOR PEAGLER | |||||||||
17CVF03532 | RACHEL FARACI | 12/22/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs RACHEL FARACI | |||||||||
17CVF03726 | KEITH FULTZ | 12/21/2017 | |||||||
CBCS vs KEITH FULTZ | |||||||||
17CVI03247 | TERESA MANCUSO | 12/21/2017 | |||||||
STEPHEN A WEEBER, D P M vs TERESA MANCUSO | |||||||||
17CVI03362 | JOSEPH DULANEY | 12/21/2017 | |||||||
GETTY LAW OFFICE, L.L.C. vs JOSEPH DULANEY | |||||||||
17CVI03616 | KEITH WOODS | 12/21/2017 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE REALTOR vs KEITH WOODS | |||||||||
17CVF02633 | THOMAS FRENCH | 12/20/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs THOMAS FRENCH | |||||||||
17CVF02645 | VINCENT VIRTULLO | 12/20/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs VINCENT VIRTULLO | |||||||||
17CVF03651 | KATHY L. ATKINS | 12/19/2017 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET vs KATHY L. ATKINS | |||||||||
17CVF03604 | DAWN L COBY | 12/19/2017 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, P.C. vs DAWN L COBY | |||||||||
17CVF03389 | TERRI L SANDERS | 12/19/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs TERRI L SANDERS | |||||||||
17CVF03388 | MICHELLE M SIPPLE | 12/19/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs MICHELLE M SIPPLE | |||||||||
17CVF03312 | BRITTANY GARRETT | 12/19/2017 | |||||||
SOUTHEASTERN EMERGENCY SERVICES vs BRITTANY GARRETT | |||||||||
17CVF03127 | BERNARD VENEY | 12/19/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs BERNARD VENEY | |||||||||
17CVF03047 | KANAN PITTMAN | 12/19/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs KANAN PITTMAN | |||||||||
17CVF02530 | TODD BETHEL | 12/19/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs TODD BETHEL | |||||||||
17CVE03489 | RENEE MARTIN | 12/19/2017 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE CO. vs RENEE MARTIN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 335, 336, 337 ... 501, 502, 503 Next |