10136 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF03715 | SHERRICKA L COLEMAN-WHITMORE | 3/2/2018 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs SHERRICKA L COLEMAN-WHITMORE | |||||||||
17CVF03723 | PAYNE ENTERPRISES INC | 3/2/2018 | |||||||
VECTREN ENERGY DELIVERY OF OHIO, vs PAYNE ENTERPRISES INC | |||||||||
17CVF03799 | JENNIFER KENDALL | 3/2/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JENNIFER KENDALL | |||||||||
18CVF02034 | AMANDA L BUCKINGHAM | 3/2/2018 | |||||||
KH NETWORK CREDIT UNION vs AMANDA L BUCKINGHAM | |||||||||
17CVI03496 | STEVEN E ADAMS | 3/2/2018 | |||||||
JAMES SLANE vs STEVEN E ADAMS | |||||||||
17CVI03581 | TAR, INC | 3/2/2018 | |||||||
BOB WILSON vs TAR, INC | |||||||||
17CVI03694 | I FORCE STAFFING LLC | 3/2/2018 | |||||||
JAMES SANTIAGO ELCAN vs I FORCE STAFFING LLC | |||||||||
17CVI03708 | JOHN C RIAZZI | 3/2/2018 | |||||||
HALEY-DUSA GROUP vs JOHN C RIAZZI | |||||||||
17CVF03629 | ANDRE L WILLIAMS | 3/2/2018 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs ANDRE L WILLIAMS | |||||||||
17CVF03733 | ANDREW MCGUFFEY | 2/28/2018 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-GOVERNORS SQUARE, LT vs ANDREW MCGUFFEY | |||||||||
17CVG03191 | ISRAEL ESPINOZA | 2/28/2018 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE GOVERNOURS SQUARE LT vs ISRAEL ESPINOZA | |||||||||
17CVF03393 | JUNE A GODIN | 2/28/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O LYONS, DAUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs JUNE A GODIN | |||||||||
17CVF03502 | JAMES C WRIGHT | 2/27/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JAMES C WRIGHT | |||||||||
17CVG03378 | LEQUANN CARTER | 2/27/2018 | |||||||
SKO PROPERTIES, LLC vs LEQUANN CARTER | |||||||||
18CVF02039 | AMANDA SCHLEGEL | 2/26/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs AMANDA SCHLEGEL | |||||||||
18CVF02243 | COLLON HICKS | 2/26/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs COLLON HICKS | |||||||||
17CVF02789 | LAKEN GARDNER | 2/23/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs LAKEN GARDNER | |||||||||
17CVF03656 | GREG ROYALTY | 2/23/2018 | |||||||
HEARTLAND FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs GREG ROYALTY | |||||||||
17CVF03660 | SHATON MORROW | 2/23/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SHATON MORROW | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 330, 331, 332 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |