10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF02614 | CLIFFORD WOOLFORK | 4/10/2018 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs CLIFFORD WOOLFORK | |||||||||
17CVF03238 | DEMPSEY SIMMONS | 4/9/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP c/o LEVY & ASSOC, LLC vs DEMPSEY SIMMONS | |||||||||
17CVF03682 | ANITRA SHEARD | 4/9/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs ANITRA SHEARD | |||||||||
17CVF03837 | CASSANDRA RUDROW | 4/9/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CASSANDRA RUDROW | |||||||||
18CVF02202 | DONNA GOLLADAY | 4/9/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs DONNA GOLLADAY | |||||||||
18CVF02234 | KEN THORNTON | 4/9/2018 | |||||||
VAUGHAN GROUP LTD vs KEN THORNTON | |||||||||
18CVF02038 | LISA MANNING | 4/6/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs LISA MANNING | |||||||||
18CVF02606 | RICHARD WALTON | 4/6/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs RICHARD WALTON | |||||||||
18CVF02051 | WILLIAM R EDWARDS | 4/6/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs WILLIAM R EDWARDS | |||||||||
17CVF03869 | CAILIN L CORNETT | 4/6/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, P.C. vs CAILIN L CORNETT | |||||||||
17CVF03839 | MELISSA CASE | 4/6/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MELISSA CASE | |||||||||
17CVF03623 | ANDREW PARSONS | 4/6/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ANDREW PARSONS | |||||||||
17CVF03549 | MICHAEL LEONARD | 4/6/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MICHAEL LEONARD | |||||||||
17CVE03632 | LANA L WILSON | 4/5/2018 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs LANA L WILSON | |||||||||
17CVF03509 | JOHN E WETZIG III | 4/5/2018 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INT TO TARGET NAT'L vs JOHN E WETZIG III | |||||||||
18CVF02052 | TIFFANI M GALLIMORE | 4/5/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs TIFFANI M GALLIMORE | |||||||||
18CVF02102 | ROGER A. ADAMS | 4/5/2018 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION, INC vs ROGER A. ADAMS | |||||||||
17CVF02769 | MAXIMUM RESTORATION GENERAL CONTRACTORS | 4/4/2018 | |||||||
CHRIS HAGENBUCH vs MAXIMUM RESTORATION GENERAL CONTRACTORS | |||||||||
17CVF03504 | STEFFAN WINKLE | 4/4/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs STEFFAN WINKLE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 322, 323, 324 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |