10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF02127 | WADE KEHNER | 4/27/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs WADE KEHNER | |||||||||
17CVF02908 | JESSICA HEFFNER | 4/27/2018 | |||||||
BARTLEY'S LAWN SERVICE, LLC vs JESSICA HEFFNER | |||||||||
17CVF03526 | RAM RESTORATION LLC C/O GREGROY S. PAGE, REGISTERE... | 4/26/2018 | |||||||
PRO-PAINTING-SOLUTIONS, LLC vs RAM RESTORATION LLC c/o Gregroy S. Page, Registere... | |||||||||
18CVF02386 | JENNIFER TEMPLE | 4/26/2018 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs JENNIFER TEMPLE | |||||||||
18CVI02255 | JESSICA LYNN VIRES | 4/26/2018 | |||||||
JAMES R PALMER vs JESSICA LYNN VIRES | |||||||||
18CVI02347 | PAUL HEATHERLY | 4/26/2018 | |||||||
ROSA MARILU MONCAYO vs PAUL HEATHERLY | |||||||||
18CVE02212 | ANTHONY BRIMMER | 4/25/2018 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE CO. vs ANTHONY BRIMMER | |||||||||
18CVF02006 | JOSHUA D EVERSOLE | 4/25/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs JOSHUA D EVERSOLE | |||||||||
18CVF02232 | TIFFANY B LORD | 4/25/2018 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET vs TIFFANY B LORD | |||||||||
18CVF02179 | HENRY MULLINS | 4/24/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs HENRY MULLINS | |||||||||
18CVF02199 | LACEY STRINGFIELD | 4/24/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs LACEY STRINGFIELD | |||||||||
17CVF03107 | KYMBERLY UPTON | 4/24/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KYMBERLY UPTON | |||||||||
18CVF02071 | DENALE ISAACS | 4/23/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs DENALE ISAACS | |||||||||
17CVF03448 | BREANNA DURBIN | 4/20/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs BREANNA DURBIN | |||||||||
17CVF03749 | NORMA SHOOK | 4/20/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs NORMA SHOOK | |||||||||
17CVF03833 | PATRICIA ASCH | 4/20/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs PATRICIA ASCH | |||||||||
18CVF02049 | LEONARD W JENKINS | 4/20/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs LEONARD W JENKINS | |||||||||
18CVF02074 | MANNING HILL | 4/20/2018 | |||||||
DAY AIR CRAEDIT UNION vs MANNING HILL | |||||||||
18CVF02172 | DANIEL W CAHALL | 4/20/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs DANIEL W CAHALL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 320, 321, 322 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |