10058 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVI03424 | ANITA HARTLEY | 4/18/2018 | |||||||
DAWN M MAINS vs ANITA HARTLEY | |||||||||
18CVF02482 | BROOKE AMMONS | 4/18/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs BROOKE AMMONS | |||||||||
17CVF03767 | MATTHEW P BAYNE | 4/16/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs MATTHEW P BAYNE | |||||||||
18CVF02125 | JAMES BEST | 4/16/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P vs JAMES BEST | |||||||||
18CVF02126 | ELIZABETH A WILKINS | 4/16/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs ELIZABETH A WILKINS | |||||||||
18CVF02226 | DANIEL R SEATON | 4/16/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs DANIEL R SEATON | |||||||||
17CVF03301 | VALERIE D DOBBINS | 4/13/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs VALERIE D DOBBINS | |||||||||
18CVF02111 | HEATHER L WILLIAMSON | 4/13/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SERVICER FOR WELLS FARGO BANK vs HEATHER L WILLIAMSON | |||||||||
18CVF02362 | MICHELLE DOYLE | 4/13/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs MICHELLE DOYLE | |||||||||
18CVI02150 | NOEMI GUADELUPE | 4/13/2018 | |||||||
LAKE WASHINGTON CONDOMINIUM OWNE ASSOCIATION INC vs NOEMI GUADELUPE | |||||||||
17CVF03028 | KATHERINE MARSHALL | 4/12/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs KATHERINE MARSHALL | |||||||||
17CVF03344 | PATRICK OVERMEYER JR. | 4/12/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs PATRICK OVERMEYER Jr. | |||||||||
17CVF03763 | TRISH LYNN HOLLEN | 4/11/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs TRISH LYNN HOLLEN | |||||||||
18CVF02417 | MARLEN JIMENEZ | 4/11/2018 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs MARLEN JIMENEZ | |||||||||
17CVF02005 | BENJAMIN LEONARD | 4/10/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs BENJAMIN LEONARD | |||||||||
18CVF02614 | CLIFFORD WOOLFORK | 4/10/2018 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs CLIFFORD WOOLFORK | |||||||||
17CVF03238 | DEMPSEY SIMMONS | 4/9/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP c/o LEVY & ASSOC, LLC vs DEMPSEY SIMMONS | |||||||||
17CVF03682 | ANITRA SHEARD | 4/9/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs ANITRA SHEARD | |||||||||
17CVF03837 | CASSANDRA RUDROW | 4/9/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CASSANDRA RUDROW | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 318, 319, 320 ... 501, 502, 503 Next |